MT SB333 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 29 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-29 - (H) Died in Standing Committee (H) Judiciary
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 29 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-29 - (H) Died in Standing Committee (H) Judiciary
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Generally revise drug and human trafficking laws
Title
Generally revise drug and human trafficking laws
Sponsors
Sen. Brad Molnar [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-04-08 - Senate - (S) 3rd Reading Passed (Y: 40 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-04-07 - Senate - (S) Finance and Claims Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed (Y: 13 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-01 - Senate - (S) 2nd Reading Motion to Amend Carried (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-01 - Senate - (S) 2nd Reading Passed as Amended (Y: 45 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-16 - Senate - (S) Judiciary Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed as Amended (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-07 - Senate - (S) Finance and Claims Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed (Y: 13 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-01 - Senate - (S) 2nd Reading Motion to Amend Carried (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-01 - Senate - (S) 2nd Reading Passed as Amended (Y: 45 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-16 - Senate - (S) Judiciary Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed as Amended (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-29 | House | (H) Died in Standing Committee (H) Judiciary |
2021-04-21 | Senate | (S) Revised Fiscal Note Printed |
2021-04-20 | House | (H) Tabled in Committee (H) Judiciary |
2021-04-20 | Senate | (S) Revised Fiscal Note Received |
2021-04-20 | House | (H) Hearing (H) Judiciary |
2021-04-15 | Senate | (S) Revised Fiscal Note Requested |
2021-04-15 | House | (H) Hearing (H) Judiciary |
2021-04-09 | House | (H) First Reading |
2021-04-09 | House | (H) Referred to Committee (H) Judiciary |
2021-04-08 | Senate | (S) Transmitted to House |
2021-04-08 | Senate | (S) 3rd Reading Passed |
2021-04-08 | Senate | (S) Scheduled for 3rd Reading |
2021-04-07 | Senate | (S) Committee Report--Bill Passed (S) Finance and Claims |
2021-04-07 | Senate | (S) Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed (S) Finance and Claims |
2021-04-07 | Senate | (S) Hearing (S) Finance and Claims |
2021-04-01 | (C) Printed - New Version Available | |
2021-04-01 | Senate | (S) Rereferred to Committee (S) Finance and Claims |
2021-04-01 | Senate | (S) 2nd Reading Passed as Amended |
2021-04-01 | Senate | (S) 2nd Reading Motion to Amend Carried |
2021-04-01 | Senate | (S) Scheduled for 2nd Reading |
2021-03-22 | Senate | (S) Revised Fiscal Note Printed |
2021-03-19 | Senate | (S) Revised Fiscal Note Received |
2021-03-17 | (C) Printed - New Version Available | |
2021-03-17 | Senate | (S) Committee Report--Bill Passed as Amended (S) Judiciary |
2021-03-16 | Senate | (S) Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed as Amended (S) Judiciary |
2021-03-16 | Senate | (S) Revised Fiscal Note Requested |
2021-03-14 | (C) Amendments Available | |
2021-03-09 | Senate | (S) Hearing (S) Judiciary |
2021-02-27 | Senate | (S) Fiscal Note Printed |
2021-02-26 | Senate | (S) Fiscal Note Received |
2021-02-23 | Senate | (S) Referred to Committee (S) Judiciary |
2021-02-22 | (C) Introduced Bill Text Available Electronically | |
2021-02-22 | Senate | (S) First Reading |
2021-02-22 | Senate | (S) Fiscal Note Requested |
2021-02-22 | Senate | (S) Introduced |
2021-02-15 | (C) Draft Delivered to Requester | |
2021-02-12 | (C) Draft Ready for Delivery | |
2021-02-12 | (C) Executive Director Final Review | |
2021-02-12 | (C) Draft Ready for Delivery | |
2021-02-11 | (C) Draft in Assembly | |
2021-02-11 | (C) Executive Director Review | |
2021-02-11 | (C) Bill Draft Text Available Electronically | |
2021-02-11 | (C) Draft in Final Drafter Review | |
2021-02-11 | (C) Draft in Input/Proofing | |
2021-02-10 | (C) Draft to Drafter - Edit Review [CMD] | |
2021-02-09 | (C) Draft in Edit | |
2021-02-02 | (C) Draft in Legal Review | |
2021-01-06 | (C) Draft to Requester for Review | |
2020-08-04 | (C) Draft Request Received |