MT SB333 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 24 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-24 - (S) Died in Standing Committee (S) State Administration
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 24 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-24 - (S) Died in Standing Committee (S) State Administration
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Establish cash balance benefit tier in TRS and PERS for new hires
Title
Establish cash balance benefit tier in TRS and PERS for new hires
Sponsors
Sen. Ron Arthun [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-04-24 | Senate | (S) Died in Standing Committee (S) State Administration |
2013-03-28 | Senate | (S) Missed Deadline for Appropriation Bill Transmittal |
2013-03-27 | Senate | (S) Tabled in Committee (S) State Administration |
2013-03-27 | Senate | (S) Bill Not Heard at Sponsor's Request (S) State Administration |
2013-03-20 | Senate | (S) Fiscal Note Printed |
2013-03-20 | Senate | (S) Hearing Canceled (S) State Administration |
2013-03-19 | Senate | (S) Fiscal Note Received |
2013-03-14 | Senate | (S) Rereferred to Committee (S) State Administration |
2013-03-13 | Senate | (S) Revised Fiscal Note Requested |
2013-03-13 | (C) Printed - New Version Available | |
2013-03-13 | Senate | (S) Committee Report--Bill Passed as Amended (H) Joint Select Committee on Pensions |
2013-03-12 | Senate | (S) Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed as Amended (H) Joint Select Committee on Pensions |
2013-03-05 | Senate | (S) Hearing (H) Joint Select Committee on Pensions |
2013-02-27 | Senate | (S) Fiscal Note Printed |
2013-02-16 | (C) Introduced Bill Text Available Electronically | |
2013-02-15 | Senate | (S) Referred to Committee (H) Joint Select Committee on Pensions |
2013-02-15 | Senate | (S) First Reading |
2013-02-15 | Senate | (S) Fiscal Note Requested |
2013-02-15 | Senate | (S) Introduced |
2013-02-15 | (C) Draft Delivered to Requester | |
2013-02-13 | (C) Draft Ready for Delivery | |
2013-02-13 | (C) Draft in Assembly/Executive Director Review | |
2013-02-13 | (C) Draft in Final Drafter Review | |
2013-02-12 | (C) Draft in Input/Proofing | |
2013-02-12 | (C) Draft to Drafter - Edit Review [CMD] | |
2013-02-07 | (C) Draft Back for Redo | |
2013-02-05 | (C) Draft Ready for Delivery | |
2013-02-05 | (C) Fiscal Note Probable | |
2013-02-05 | (C) Draft in Assembly/Executive Director Review | |
2013-02-05 | (C) Draft in Final Drafter Review | |
2013-02-04 | (C) Draft in Input/Proofing | |
2013-02-01 | (C) Draft to Drafter - Edit Review [CMD] | |
2013-01-31 | (C) Draft in Legal Review | |
2013-01-30 | (C) Draft to Requester for Review | |
2013-01-25 | (C) Draft to Requester for Review | |
2013-01-24 | (C) Draft to Requester for Review | |
2013-01-21 | (C) Draft Back for Redo | |
2013-01-09 | (C) Draft in Final Drafter Review | |
2013-01-08 | (C) Bill Draft Text Available Electronically | |
2013-01-08 | (C) Draft in Input/Proofing | |
2013-01-08 | (C) Draft to Drafter - Edit Review [CMD] | |
2013-01-07 | (C) Draft in Legal Review | |
2013-01-07 | (C) Draft Back for Redo | |
2012-12-27 | (C) Draft in Legal Review | |
2012-12-10 | (C) Draft to Requester for Review | |
2012-11-29 | (C) Draft to Requester for Review | |
2012-10-23 | (C) Draft Request Received |