MT SB299 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 24 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-24 - (H) Died in Process
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 24 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-24 - (H) Died in Process
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Create civil penalty for trespass to property
Title
Create civil penalty for trespass to property
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-04-06 - House - (H) 2nd Reading Not Concurred (Y: 41 N: 59 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-02-27 - Senate - (S) 3rd Reading Passed (Y: 27 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-27 - Senate - (S) 2nd Reading Passed (Y: 27 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-27 - Senate - (S) 3rd Reading Passed (Y: 27 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-27 - Senate - (S) 2nd Reading Passed (Y: 27 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-04-24 | House | (H) Died in Process |
2013-04-06 | House | (H) 2nd Reading Not Concurred |
2013-04-06 | House | (H) Scheduled for 2nd Reading |
2013-04-05 | House | (H) Committee Report--Bill Concurred as Amended (H) Agriculture |
2013-04-04 | House | (H) Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred as Amended (H) Agriculture |
2013-04-04 | House | (H) Hearing (H) Agriculture |
2013-04-02 | House | (H) First Reading |
2013-04-02 | House | (H) Referred to Committee (H) Agriculture |
2013-02-27 | Senate | (S) Transmitted to House |
2013-02-27 | Senate | (S) 3rd Reading Passed |
2013-02-27 | Senate | (S) Scheduled for 3rd Reading |
2013-02-27 | Senate | (S) 2nd Reading Passed |
2013-02-27 | Senate | (S) 2nd Reading Motion to Amend Failed |
2013-02-27 | Senate | (S) Scheduled for 2nd Reading |
2013-02-25 | (C) Printed - New Version Available | |
2013-02-25 | Senate | (S) Committee Report--Bill Passed as Amended (S) Judiciary |
2013-02-25 | Senate | (S) Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed as Amended (S) Judiciary |
2013-02-21 | Senate | (S) Hearing (S) Judiciary |
2013-02-13 | Senate | (S) Referred to Committee (S) Judiciary |
2013-02-13 | Senate | (S) First Reading |
2013-02-13 | (C) Introduced Bill Text Available Electronically | |
2013-02-12 | Senate | (S) Introduced |
2013-02-12 | (C) Draft Delivered to Requester | |
2013-02-11 | (C) Draft Ready for Delivery | |
2013-02-11 | (C) Draft in Assembly/Executive Director Review | |
2013-02-11 | (C) Draft in Final Drafter Review | |
2013-02-11 | (C) Bill Draft Text Available Electronically | |
2013-02-11 | (C) Draft in Input/Proofing | |
2013-02-11 | (C) Draft to Drafter - Edit Review [CMD] | |
2013-02-10 | (C) Draft in Legal Review | |
2013-02-07 | (C) Draft to Requester for Review | |
2013-02-05 | (C) Draft Taken Off Hold | |
2012-12-17 | (C) Draft On Hold | |
2012-12-04 | (C) Draft Request Received |