MT SB282 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 28 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-28 - (S) Died in Standing Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 28 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-28 - (S) Died in Standing Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Provide for student scholarship organizations and tax credits for donations
Title
Provide for student scholarship organizations and tax credits for donations
Sponsors
Sen. Dave Lewis [R] |
Roll Calls
2011-02-22 - Senate - (S) Rereferred to Committee (Y: 26 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-04-28 | (S) Died in Standing Committee | |
2011-03-30 | (S) Missed Deadline for Revenue Bill Transmittal | |
2011-03-28 | (S) Revised Fiscal Note Printed | |
2011-03-24 | (S) Revised Fiscal Note Received | |
2011-03-22 | (S) Tabled in Committee (S) Finance and Claims | |
2011-03-16 | (S) Revised Fiscal Note Requested | |
2011-03-15 | (S) Hearing (S) Finance and Claims | |
2011-02-22 | (S) Rereferred to Committee (S) Finance and Claims | |
2011-02-15 | (S) Fiscal Note Printed | |
2011-02-14 | (S) Hearing (S) Taxation | |
2011-02-14 | (S) Fiscal Note Received | |
2011-02-08 | (C) Introduced Bill Text Available Electronically | |
2011-02-08 | (S) Referred to Committee (S) Taxation | |
2011-02-08 | (S) First Reading | |
2011-02-08 | (S) Fiscal Note Requested | |
2011-02-08 | (S) Introduced | |
2011-02-04 | (C) Draft Delivered to Requester | |
2011-02-04 | (C) Draft Ready for Delivery | |
2011-02-04 | (C) Draft in Assembly/Executive Director Review | |
2011-02-03 | (C) Draft in Final Drafter Review | |
2011-02-03 | (C) Draft in Input/Proofing | |
2011-01-18 | (C) Draft Back for Redo | |
2011-01-17 | (C) Draft Taken by Drafter | |
2011-01-11 | (C) Draft Ready for Delivery | |
2011-01-10 | (C) Draft in Assembly/Executive Director Review | |
2011-01-10 | (C) Draft in Final Drafter Review | |
2011-01-07 | (C) Bill Draft Text Available Electronically | |
2011-01-07 | (C) Draft in Input/Proofing | |
2011-01-07 | (C) Draft to Drafter - Edit Review [JLN] | |
2011-01-06 | (C) Draft in Legal Review | |
2011-01-06 | (C) Draft to Requester for Review | |
2010-10-28 | (C) Fiscal Note Probable | |
2010-10-28 | (C) Draft Request Received |