MT SB266 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 2 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-03-13 - (S) Missed Deadline for General Bill Transmittal
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 2 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-03-13 - (S) Missed Deadline for General Bill Transmittal
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Generally revise child abuse and neglect laws
Title
Generally revise child abuse and neglect laws
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-02-22 - Senate - (S) Public Health, Welfare and Safety Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed as Amended (Y: 3 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-13 | Senate | (S) Missed Deadline for General Bill Transmittal |
2023-02-22 | Senate | (S) Tabled in Committee (S) Public Health, Welfare and Safety |
2023-02-17 | (C) Amendments Available | |
2023-02-14 | Senate | (S) Fiscal Note Printed |
2023-02-14 | (C) Fiscal Note Unsigned | |
2023-02-10 | Senate | (S) Fiscal Note Received |
2023-02-08 | Senate | (S) Hearing (S) Public Health, Welfare and Safety |
2023-02-03 | Senate | (S) First Reading |
2023-02-03 | Senate | (S) Referred to Committee (S) Public Health, Welfare and Safety |
2023-02-03 | (C) Introduced Bill Text Available Electronically | |
2023-02-03 | Senate | (S) Fiscal Note Requested |
2023-02-02 | Senate | (S) Introduced |
2023-02-02 | (C) Fiscal Note Probable | |
2023-02-02 | (C) Draft Delivered to Requester | |
2023-01-31 | (C) Draft Ready for Delivery | |
2023-01-31 | (C) Executive Director Final Review | |
2023-01-31 | (C) Draft Ready for Delivery | |
2023-01-30 | (C) Draft in Assembly | |
2023-01-30 | (C) Executive Director Review | |
2023-01-29 | (C) Bill Draft Text Available Electronically | |
2023-01-29 | (C) Draft in Final Drafter Review | |
2023-01-29 | (C) Draft in Input/Proofing | |
2023-01-28 | (C) Draft to Drafter - Edit Review | |
2023-01-26 | (C) Draft in Edit | |
2023-01-21 | (C) Draft in Legal Review | |
2023-01-10 | (C) Draft to Requester for Review | |
2022-10-12 | (C) Draft Request Received |