MT SB266 | 2009 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 28 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-04-28 - (S) Died in Standing Committee  
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 28 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-04-28 - (S) Died in Standing Committee  
Summary
Authorize school levy to pay health insurance premiums
Title
Authorize school levy to pay health insurance premiums
Sponsors
Sen. Mike Cooney [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-04-28 | (S) Died in Standing Committee   | |
2009-03-31 | (S) Missed Deadline for Revenue Bill Transmittal   | |
2009-02-16 | (S) Tabled in Committee (S) Education and Cultural Resources | |
2009-01-31 | (S) Fiscal Note Printed   | |
2009-01-30 | (S) Fiscal Note Signed   | |
2009-01-30 | (S) Hearing (S) Education and Cultural Resources | |
2009-01-30 | (S) Fiscal Note Received   | |
2009-01-22 | (C) Introduced Bill Text Available Electronically   | |
2009-01-22 | (S) First Reading   | |
2009-01-22 | (S) Fiscal Note Requested   | |
2009-01-22 | (S) Referred to Committee (S) Education and Cultural Resources | |
2009-01-22 | (S) Introduced   | |
2009-01-20 | (C) Draft Delivered to Requester   | |
2009-01-20 | (C) Draft Ready for Delivery   | |
2009-01-17 | (C) Draft in Assembly/Executive Director Review   | |
2009-01-16 | (C) Draft in Final Drafter Review   | |
2009-01-16 | (C) Bill Draft Text Available Electronically   | |
2009-01-16 | (C) Draft in Input/Proofing   | |
2009-01-16 | (C) Draft to Drafter - Edit Review [SAB]   | |
2009-01-16 | (C) Draft in Edit   | |
2009-01-15 | (C) Draft in Legal Review   | |
2009-01-15 | (C) Draft to Requester for Review   | |
2009-01-15 | (C) Fiscal Note Probable   | |
2009-01-15 | (C) Draft Request Received   |
Subjects
Montana State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://laws.leg.mt.gov/laws09/LAW0210W$BSIV.ActionQuery?P_BILL_NO1=266&P_BLTP_BILL_TYP_CD=SB&Z_ACTION=Find |