MT SB253 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 24 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-24 - (S) Died in Standing Committee (S) Local Government
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 24 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-24 - (S) Died in Standing Committee (S) Local Government
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Require public employee unions to file annual report & recertify every 3 years
Title
Require public employee unions to file annual report & recertify every 3 years
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-04-24 | Senate | (S) Died in Standing Committee (S) Local Government |
2013-02-28 | Senate | (S) Missed Deadline for General Bill Transmittal |
2013-02-26 | Senate | (S) Fiscal Note Printed |
2013-02-23 | Senate | (S) Fiscal Note Received |
2013-02-22 | Senate | (S) Tabled in Committee (S) Local Government |
2013-02-22 | Senate | (S) Hearing (S) Local Government |
2013-02-19 | Senate | (S) Fiscal Note Requested |
2013-02-19 | Senate | (S) Fiscal Note Requested |
2013-02-15 | Senate | (S) Referred to Committee (S) Local Government |
2013-02-15 | Senate | (S) First Reading |
2013-02-05 | (C) Introduced Bill Text Available Electronically | |
2013-02-04 | Senate | (S) Introduced |
2013-02-04 | (C) Draft Delivered to Requester | |
2013-01-30 | (C) Draft Ready for Delivery | |
2013-01-30 | (C) Draft in Assembly/Executive Director Review | |
2013-01-30 | (C) Draft in Final Drafter Review | |
2013-01-29 | (C) Bill Draft Text Available Electronically | |
2013-01-29 | (C) Draft in Input/Proofing | |
2013-01-29 | (C) Draft in Legal Review | |
2013-01-29 | (C) Draft Back for Redo | |
2013-01-29 | (C) Draft to Drafter - Edit Review [SAB] | |
2013-01-28 | (C) Draft in Legal Review | |
2013-01-28 | (C) Draft to Requester for Review | |
2013-01-06 | (C) Draft Request Received |
Subjects
Montana State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://laws.leg.mt.gov/legprd/LAW0210W$BSIV.ActionQuery?P_BILL_NO1=253&P_BLTP_BILL_TYP_CD=SB&Z_ACTION=Find&P_SESS=20131 |
Text | https://leg.mt.gov/bills/2013/sb0299/SB0253_1.pdf |