MT SB252 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on April 1 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-01 - Chapter Number Assigned
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on April 1 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-01 - Chapter Number Assigned
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Generally revise irrigation district laws related to elections
Title
Generally revise irrigation district laws related to elections
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2013-03-15 - House - (H) 3rd Reading Concurred (Y: 74 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2013-03-14 - House - (H) 2nd Reading Concurred (Y: 72 N: 28 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-18 - Senate - (S) 3rd Reading Passed (Y: 45 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2013-02-16 - Senate - (S) 2nd Reading Passed (Y: 43 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2013-03-14 - House - (H) 2nd Reading Concurred (Y: 72 N: 28 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-18 - Senate - (S) 3rd Reading Passed (Y: 45 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2013-02-16 - Senate - (S) 2nd Reading Passed (Y: 43 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-04-01 | Chapter Number Assigned | |
2013-03-21 | Senate | (S) Transmitted to Governor |
2013-03-20 | House | (H) Signed by Speaker |
2013-03-19 | Senate | (S) Signed by President |
2013-03-18 | Senate | (S) Returned from Enrolling |
2013-03-18 | (C) Printed - Enrolled Version Available | |
2013-03-16 | Senate | (S) Sent to Enrolling |
2013-03-16 | House | (H) Returned to Senate |
2013-03-15 | House | (H) 3rd Reading Concurred |
2013-03-15 | House | (H) Scheduled for 3rd Reading |
2013-03-14 | (C) Printed - New Version Available | |
2013-03-14 | (C) Sponsors Engrossed | |
2013-03-14 | House | (H) 2nd Reading Concurred |
2013-03-14 | House | (H) Scheduled for 2nd Reading |
2013-03-13 | House | (H) Committee Report--Bill Concurred (H) Agriculture |
2013-03-12 | House | (H) Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred (H) Agriculture |
2013-03-07 | House | (H) Hearing (H) Agriculture |
2013-02-26 | House | (H) First Reading |
2013-02-26 | House | (H) Referred to Committee (H) Agriculture |
2013-02-19 | Senate | (S) Transmitted to House |
2013-02-18 | Senate | (S) 3rd Reading Passed |
2013-02-18 | Senate | (S) Scheduled for 3rd Reading |
2013-02-16 | Senate | (S) 2nd Reading Passed |
2013-02-16 | Senate | (S) Scheduled for 2nd Reading |
2013-02-13 | Senate | (S) Committee Report--Bill Passed (S) Agriculture, Livestock and Irrigation |
2013-02-12 | Senate | (S) Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed (S) Agriculture, Livestock and Irrigation |
2013-02-12 | Senate | (S) Hearing (S) Agriculture, Livestock and Irrigation |
2013-02-05 | Senate | (S) Referred to Committee (S) Agriculture, Livestock and Irrigation |
2013-02-05 | Senate | (S) First Reading |
2013-02-05 | (C) Introduced Bill Text Available Electronically | |
2013-02-04 | Senate | (S) Introduced |
2013-02-04 | (C) Draft Delivered to Requester | |
2013-02-04 | (C) Draft Ready for Delivery | |
2013-02-01 | (C) Draft in Assembly/Executive Director Review | |
2013-02-01 | (C) Draft in Final Drafter Review | |
2013-02-01 | (C) Bill Draft Text Available Electronically | |
2013-02-01 | (C) Draft in Input/Proofing | |
2013-02-01 | (C) Draft in Legal Review | |
2013-02-01 | (C) Draft Back for Redo | |
2013-01-31 | (C) Draft in Legal Review | |
2013-01-31 | (C) Draft to Requester for Review | |
2013-01-09 | (C) Draft Taken Off Hold | |
2012-12-06 | (C) Draft On Hold | |
2012-12-05 | (C) Draft Request Received |