MT SB23 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 25 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-25 - (H) Died in Process
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 25 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-25 - (H) Died in Process
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Require accommodations to employer-mandated vaccinations to be uniformly offered
Title
Require accommodations to employer-mandated vaccinations to be uniformly offered
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-02 - House - (H) 2nd Reading Not Concurred (Y: 42 N: 57 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2019-03-21 - House - (H) Judiciary Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred (Y: 11 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-01 - Senate - (S) 3rd Reading Passed (Y: 29 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-01-31 - Senate - (S) 2nd Reading Passed (Y: 30 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-01-29 - Senate - (S) Judiciary Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed as Amended (Y: 6 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-21 - House - (H) Judiciary Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred (Y: 11 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-01 - Senate - (S) 3rd Reading Passed (Y: 29 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-01-31 - Senate - (S) 2nd Reading Passed (Y: 30 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-01-29 - Senate - (S) Judiciary Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed as Amended (Y: 6 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-25 | House | (H) Died in Process |
2019-04-02 | House | (H) 2nd Reading Not Concurred |
2019-04-02 | House | (H) Scheduled for 2nd Reading |
2019-03-21 | House | (H) Committee Report--Bill Concurred (H) Judiciary |
2019-03-21 | House | (H) Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred (H) Judiciary |
2019-03-18 | House | (H) Hearing (H) Judiciary |
2019-03-11 | House | (H) Hearing Canceled (H) Judiciary |
2019-02-05 | House | (H) First Reading (H) Judiciary |
2019-02-05 | House | (H) Referred to Committee (H) Judiciary |
2019-02-01 | Senate | (S) Transmitted to House |
2019-02-01 | Senate | (S) 3rd Reading Passed |
2019-02-01 | Senate | (S) Scheduled for 3rd Reading |
2019-01-31 | Senate | (S) 2nd Reading Passed |
2019-01-31 | Senate | (S) Scheduled for 2nd Reading |
2019-01-29 | (C) Printed - New Version Available | |
2019-01-29 | Senate | (S) Committee Report--Bill Passed as Amended (S) Judiciary |
2019-01-29 | Senate | (S) Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed as Amended (S) Judiciary |
2019-01-25 | Senate | (S) Hearing (S) Judiciary |
2019-01-09 | Senate | (S) Rereferred to Committee (S) Judiciary |
2019-01-07 | Senate | (S) First Reading |
2018-12-21 | Senate | (S) Referred to Committee (S) Public Health, Welfare and Safety |
2018-12-05 | (C) Introduced Bill Text Available Electronically | |
2018-12-05 | Senate | (S) Introduced |
2018-11-27 | (C) Pre-Introduction Letter Sent | |
2018-11-27 | (C) Draft in Assembly | |
2018-11-27 | (C) Executive Director Review | |
2018-11-21 | (C) Bill Draft Text Available Electronically | |
2018-11-21 | (C) Draft in Final Drafter Review | |
2018-11-13 | (C) Draft to Drafter - Edit Review [KWK] | |
2018-11-08 | (C) Draft in Legal Review | |
2018-11-08 | (C) Draft Back for Redo | |
2018-11-06 | (C) Draft in Input/Proofing | |
2018-11-05 | (C) Draft to Drafter - Edit Review [KWK] | |
2018-11-01 | (C) Draft in Edit | |
2018-10-31 | (C) Draft in Legal Review | |
2018-10-31 | (C) Draft to Requester for Review | |
2018-10-17 | (C) Draft Request Received |