MT SB23 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on May 7 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-07 - Chapter Number Assigned
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on May 7 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-07 - Chapter Number Assigned
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Revise interim zoning laws
Title
Revise interim zoning laws
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2013-04-17 - House - (H) 3rd Reading Governor's Proposed Amendments Adopted (Y: 97 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-16 - House - (H) 2nd Reading Governor's Proposed Amendments Adopted (Y: 95 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-05 - Senate - (S) 3rd Reading Governor's Proposed Amendments Adopted (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 21) [PASS]
2013-04-04 - Senate - (S) 2nd Reading Governor's Proposed Amendments Adopted (Y: 47 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-13 - House - (H) 3rd Reading Concurred (Y: 58 N: 38 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2013-03-12 - House - (H) 2nd Reading Concurred (Y: 60 N: 40 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-08 - Senate - (S) 3rd Reading Passed (Y: 28 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-07 - Senate - (S) 2nd Reading Passed (Y: 28 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-16 - House - (H) 2nd Reading Governor's Proposed Amendments Adopted (Y: 95 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-05 - Senate - (S) 3rd Reading Governor's Proposed Amendments Adopted (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 21) [PASS]
2013-04-04 - Senate - (S) 2nd Reading Governor's Proposed Amendments Adopted (Y: 47 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-13 - House - (H) 3rd Reading Concurred (Y: 58 N: 38 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2013-03-12 - House - (H) 2nd Reading Concurred (Y: 60 N: 40 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-08 - Senate - (S) 3rd Reading Passed (Y: 28 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-07 - Senate - (S) 2nd Reading Passed (Y: 28 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-07 | Chapter Number Assigned | |
2013-04-26 | Senate | (S) Transmitted to Governor |
2013-04-25 | House | (H) Signed by Speaker |
2013-04-24 | Senate | (S) Signed by President |
2013-04-19 | Senate | (S) Returned from Enrolling |
2013-04-19 | (C) Printed - Enrolled Version Available | |
2013-04-18 | Senate | (S) Sent to Enrolling |
2013-04-18 | (C) Printed - New Version Available | |
2013-04-17 | House | (H) Returned to Senate Concurred in Governor's Proposed Amendments |
2013-04-17 | House | (H) 3rd Reading Governor's Proposed Amendments Adopted |
2013-04-17 | House | (H) Scheduled for 3rd Reading |
2013-04-16 | House | (H) 2nd Reading Governor's Proposed Amendments Adopted |
2013-04-16 | House | (H) Scheduled for 2nd Reading |
2013-04-06 | Senate | (S) Transmitted to House for Consideration of Governor's Proposed Amendments |
2013-04-05 | Senate | (S) 3rd Reading Governor's Proposed Amendments Adopted |
2013-04-05 | Senate | (S) Scheduled for 3rd Reading |
2013-04-04 | Senate | (S) 2nd Reading Governor's Proposed Amendments Adopted |
2013-04-04 | Senate | (S) Scheduled for 2nd Reading |
2013-03-29 | Senate | (S) Returned with Governor's Proposed Amendments |
2013-03-21 | Senate | (S) Transmitted to Governor |
2013-03-20 | House | (H) Signed by Speaker |
2013-03-19 | Senate | (S) Signed by President |
2013-03-15 | (C) Printed - Enrolled Version Available | |
2013-03-15 | Senate | (S) Returned from Enrolling |
2013-03-14 | Senate | (S) Sent to Enrolling |
2013-03-14 | House | (H) Returned to Senate |
2013-03-13 | House | (H) 3rd Reading Concurred |
2013-03-13 | House | (H) Scheduled for 3rd Reading |
2013-03-12 | House | (H) 2nd Reading Concurred |
2013-03-12 | House | (H) Scheduled for 2nd Reading |
2013-03-08 | House | (H) Committee Report--Bill Concurred (H) Local Government |
2013-03-07 | House | (H) Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred (H) Local Government |
2013-03-05 | House | (H) Hearing (H) Local Government |
2013-02-26 | House | (H) First Reading |
2013-02-25 | House | (H) Referred to Committee (H) Local Government |
2013-02-09 | Senate | (S) Transmitted to House |
2013-02-08 | Senate | (S) 3rd Reading Passed |
2013-02-08 | Senate | (S) Scheduled for 3rd Reading |
2013-02-07 | Senate | (S) 2nd Reading Passed |
2013-02-07 | Senate | (S) Scheduled for 2nd Reading |
2013-02-05 | (C) Printed - New Version Available | |
2013-02-05 | Senate | (S) Committee Report--Bill Passed as Amended (S) Local Government |
2013-02-04 | Senate | (S) Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed as Amended (S) Local Government |
2013-01-31 | Senate | (S) Taken from 2nd Reading; Rereferred to Committee (S) Local Government |
2013-01-31 | Senate | (S) Scheduled for 2nd Reading |
2013-01-26 | Senate | (S) Committee Report--Bill Passed as Amended (S) Local Government |
2013-01-26 | (C) Printed - New Version Available | |
2013-01-25 | Senate | (S) Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed as Amended (S) Local Government |
2013-01-14 | Senate | (S) Hearing (S) Local Government |
2013-01-07 | Senate | (S) First Reading |
2012-12-14 | Senate | (S) Referred to Committee (S) Local Government |
2012-12-03 | (C) Introduced Bill Text Available Electronically | |
2012-12-03 | Senate | (S) Introduced |
2012-11-28 | (C) Pre-Introduction Letter Sent | |
2012-11-28 | (C) Draft in Assembly/Executive Director Review | |
2012-11-27 | (C) Draft in Final Drafter Review | |
2012-11-26 | (C) Bill Draft Text Available Electronically | |
2012-11-26 | (C) Draft in Input/Proofing | |
2012-11-26 | (C) Draft to Drafter - Edit Review [SAB] | |
2012-11-26 | (C) Draft in Legal Review | |
2012-11-20 | (C) Draft to Requester for Review | |
2012-11-08 | (C) Draft Request Received |