MT SB219 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 25 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-25 - (S) Died in Standing Committee (S) Business, Labor, and Economic Affairs
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 25 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-25 - (S) Died in Standing Committee (S) Business, Labor, and Economic Affairs
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Increase time for filing contractor, subcontractor liens
Title
Increase time for filing contractor, subcontractor liens
Sponsors
Sen. Mike Cuffe [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-25 | Senate | (S) Died in Standing Committee (S) Business, Labor, and Economic Affairs |
2019-03-01 | Senate | (S) Missed Deadline for General Bill Transmittal |
2019-02-15 | Senate | (S) Tabled in Committee (S) Business, Labor, and Economic Affairs |
2019-02-14 | Senate | (S) Hearing (S) Business, Labor, and Economic Affairs |
2019-02-06 | (C) Introduced Bill Text Available Electronically | |
2019-02-06 | Senate | (S) Referred to Committee (S) Business, Labor, and Economic Affairs |
2019-02-06 | Senate | (S) First Reading |
2019-02-06 | Senate | (S) Introduced |
2019-02-05 | (C) Draft Delivered to Requester | |
2019-02-04 | (C) Draft Ready for Delivery | |
2019-02-04 | (C) Executive Director Final Review | |
2019-02-04 | (C) Draft in Assembly | |
2019-02-04 | (C) Executive Director Review | |
2019-02-04 | (C) Bill Draft Text Available Electronically | |
2019-02-04 | (C) Draft in Final Drafter Review | |
2019-02-01 | (C) Draft to Drafter - Edit Review [CMD] | |
2019-02-01 | (C) Draft in Edit | |
2019-01-31 | (C) Draft in Legal Review | |
2019-01-30 | (C) Draft to Requester for Review | |
2019-01-24 | (C) Draft Taken Off Hold | |
2018-12-17 | (C) Draft On Hold | |
2018-11-12 | (C) Draft Request Received |
Subjects
Montana State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://laws.leg.mt.gov/legprd/LAW0210W$BSIV.ActionQuery?P_BILL_NO1=219&P_BLTP_BILL_TYP_CD=SB&Z_ACTION=Find&P_SESS=20191 |
Text | https://leg.mt.gov/bills/2019/SB0299/SB0219_1.pdf |