MT SB213 | 2009 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 28 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-04-28 - (H) Died in Standing Committee  
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 28 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-04-28 - (H) Died in Standing Committee  
Summary
Require FWP plan to manage wildlife to prevent disease transmission
Title
Require FWP plan to manage wildlife to prevent disease transmission
Sponsors
Sen. Keith Bales [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-04-28 | (H) Died in Standing Committee   | |
2009-03-27 | (H) Committee Vote Failed; Remains in Committee (H) Fish, Wildlife and Parks | |
2009-03-19 | (H) Hearing (H) Fish, Wildlife and Parks | |
2009-02-19 | (H) First Reading   | |
2009-02-19 | (H) Referred to Committee (H) Fish, Wildlife and Parks | |
2009-02-18 | (S) Transmitted to House   | |
2009-02-18 | (S) 3rd Reading Passed   | |
2009-02-18 | (S) Scheduled for 3rd Reading   | |
2009-02-17 | (S) 2nd Reading Passed on Voice Vote   | |
2009-02-17 | (S) Scheduled for 2nd Reading   | |
2009-02-16 | (S) Scheduled for 2nd Reading   | |
2009-02-13 | (C) Printed - New Version Available   | |
2009-02-13 | (S) Committee Report--Bill Passed as Amended (S) Fish and Game | |
2009-02-13 | (S) Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed as Amended (S) Fish and Game | |
2009-02-03 | (S) Hearing (S) Fish and Game | |
2009-01-22 | (S) Fiscal Note Printed   | |
2009-01-22 | (S) Fiscal Note Signed   | |
2009-01-20 | (S) Fiscal Note Received   | |
2009-01-13 | (C) Introduced Bill Text Available Electronically   | |
2009-01-13 | (S) First Reading   | |
2009-01-13 | (S) Fiscal Note Requested   | |
2009-01-13 | (S) Referred to Committee (S) Fish and Game | |
2009-01-13 | (S) Introduced   | |
2009-01-12 | (C) Draft Delivered to Requester   | |
2009-01-07 | (C) Draft Ready for Delivery   | |
2009-01-06 | (C) Draft in Assembly/Executive Director Review   | |
2009-01-05 | (C) Draft in Final Drafter Review   | |
2009-01-05 | (C) Draft in Input/Proofing   | |
2009-01-05 | (C) Draft to Drafter - Edit Review [SAB]   | |
2009-01-05 | (C) Draft in Edit   | |
2009-01-05 | (C) Draft in Legal Review   | |
2009-01-05 | (C) Draft Back for Redo   | |
2009-01-05 | (C) Draft in Final Drafter Review   | |
2009-01-05 | (C) Bill Draft Text Available Electronically   | |
2009-01-05 | (C) Draft in Input/Proofing   | |
2009-01-02 | (C) Draft to Drafter - Edit Review [SAB]   | |
2009-01-02 | (C) Draft in Edit   | |
2009-01-02 | (C) Draft in Legal Review   | |
2008-12-16 | (C) Draft to Requester for Review   | |
2008-12-16 | (C) Fiscal Note Probable   | |
2008-12-16 | (C) Draft Back for Requester Changes   | |
2008-12-16 | (C) Draft Taken Off Hold   | |
2008-11-07 | (C) Draft On Hold   | |
2008-10-21 | (C) Draft to Requester for Review   | |
2008-07-09 | (C) Draft Request Received   |
Subjects
Montana State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://laws.leg.mt.gov/laws09/LAW0210W$BSIV.ActionQuery?P_BILL_NO1=213&P_BLTP_BILL_TYP_CD=SB&Z_ACTION=Find |