MT SB212 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 24 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-24 - (H) Died in Standing Committee (H) Agriculture
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 24 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-24 - (H) Died in Standing Committee (H) Agriculture
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Generally revise credit bureau reporting laws
Title
Generally revise credit bureau reporting laws
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-02-20 - Senate - (S) 3rd Reading Passed (Y: 39 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-02-19 - Senate - (S) 2nd Reading Passed (Y: 40 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2013-02-19 - Senate - (S) 2nd Reading Passed (Y: 40 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-04-24 | House | (H) Died in Standing Committee (H) Agriculture |
2013-04-04 | House | (H) Tabled in Committee (H) Agriculture |
2013-04-04 | House | (H) Hearing (H) Agriculture |
2013-03-25 | House | (H) First Reading |
2013-03-25 | House | (H) Referred to Committee (H) Agriculture |
2013-02-21 | Senate | (S) Transmitted to House |
2013-02-20 | Senate | (S) 3rd Reading Passed |
2013-02-20 | Senate | (S) Scheduled for 3rd Reading |
2013-02-19 | Senate | (S) 2nd Reading Passed |
2013-02-19 | Senate | (S) Scheduled for 2nd Reading |
2013-02-14 | (C) Printed - New Version Available | |
2013-02-14 | Senate | (S) Committee Report--Bill Passed as Amended (S) Business, Labor, and Economic Affairs |
2013-02-14 | Senate | (S) Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed as Amended (S) Business, Labor, and Economic Affairs |
2013-02-12 | Senate | (S) Hearing (S) Business, Labor, and Economic Affairs |
2013-01-30 | Senate | (S) Referred to Committee (S) Business, Labor, and Economic Affairs |
2013-01-30 | Senate | (S) First Reading |
2013-01-30 | (C) Introduced Bill Text Available Electronically | |
2013-01-29 | Senate | (S) Introduced |
2013-01-28 | (C) Draft Delivered to Requester | |
2013-01-26 | (C) Draft Ready for Delivery | |
2013-01-25 | (C) Draft in Assembly/Executive Director Review | |
2013-01-25 | (C) Draft in Final Drafter Review | |
2013-01-24 | (C) Bill Draft Text Available Electronically | |
2013-01-24 | (C) Draft in Input/Proofing | |
2013-01-24 | (C) Draft to Drafter - Edit Review [SAB] | |
2013-01-23 | (C) Draft in Legal Review | |
2013-01-21 | (C) Draft to Requester for Review | |
2013-01-02 | (C) Draft On Hold | |
2012-12-18 | (C) Draft Request Received |