MT SB2 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on November 28 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-03-13 - (S) Missed Deadline for General Bill Transmittal
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on November 28 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-03-13 - (S) Missed Deadline for General Bill Transmittal
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Revise criminal intelligence information advisory council
Title
Revise criminal intelligence information advisory council
Sponsors
Sen. Jen Gross [D] |
Roll Calls
2023-01-06 - Senate - (S) Judiciary Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed as Amended (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-13 | Senate | (S) Missed Deadline for General Bill Transmittal |
2023-01-06 | Senate | (S) Tabled in Committee (S) Judiciary |
2023-01-06 | Senate | (S) Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed as Amended (S) Judiciary |
2023-01-05 | (C) Amendments Available | |
2023-01-04 | Senate | (S) Hearing (S) Judiciary |
2023-01-02 | Senate | (S) First Reading |
2022-12-02 | Senate | (S) Referred to Committee (S) Judiciary |
2022-12-01 | (C) Introduced Bill Text Available Electronically | |
2022-11-28 | Senate | (S) Introduced |
2022-11-02 | (C) Draft in Assembly | |
2022-11-02 | (C) Executive Director Review | |
2022-11-01 | (C) Bill Draft Text Available Electronically | |
2022-11-01 | (C) Draft in Final Drafter Review | |
2022-11-01 | (C) Draft in Input/Proofing | |
2022-11-01 | (C) Bill Draft Text Available Electronically | |
2022-11-01 | (C) Draft in Final Drafter Review | |
2022-09-19 | (C) Draft in Input/Proofing | |
2022-09-19 | (C) Draft to Drafter - Edit Review | |
2022-09-19 | (C) Draft in Edit | |
2022-09-15 | (C) Draft in Legal Review | |
2022-07-26 | (C) Draft Request Received |