MT SB196 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 22 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-22 - Chapter Number Assigned
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 22 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-22 - Chapter Number Assigned
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Generally revise polling place hours laws
Title
Generally revise polling place hours laws
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-31 - Senate - (S) 3rd Reading Passed as Amended by House (Y: 29 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-30 - Senate - (S) 2nd Reading House Amendments Concurred (Y: 31 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-26 - House - (H) 3rd Reading Concurred (Y: 67 N: 31 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-03-25 - House - (H) 2nd Reading Concurred (Y: 68 N: 32 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-15 - House - (H) State Administration Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred as Amended (Y: 12 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-24 - Senate - (S) 3rd Reading Passed (Y: 27 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-23 - Senate - (S) 2nd Reading Passed (Y: 26 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-17 - Senate - (S) State Administration Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-30 - Senate - (S) 2nd Reading House Amendments Concurred (Y: 31 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-26 - House - (H) 3rd Reading Concurred (Y: 67 N: 31 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-03-25 - House - (H) 2nd Reading Concurred (Y: 68 N: 32 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-15 - House - (H) State Administration Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred as Amended (Y: 12 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-24 - Senate - (S) 3rd Reading Passed (Y: 27 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-23 - Senate - (S) 2nd Reading Passed (Y: 26 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-17 - Senate - (S) State Administration Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-22 | Chapter Number Assigned | |
2021-04-22 | Senate | (S) Signed by Governor |
2021-04-13 | Senate | (S) Transmitted to Governor |
2021-04-12 | House | (H) Signed by Speaker |
2021-04-08 | Senate | (S) Signed by President |
2021-04-06 | (C) Printed - Enrolled Version Available | |
2021-04-06 | Senate | (S) Returned from Enrolling |
2021-03-31 | Senate | (S) Sent to Enrolling |
2021-03-31 | Senate | (S) 3rd Reading Passed as Amended by House |
2021-03-31 | Senate | (S) Scheduled for 3rd Reading |
2021-03-30 | Senate | (S) 2nd Reading House Amendments Concurred |
2021-03-30 | Senate | (S) Scheduled for 2nd Reading |
2021-03-26 | House | (H) Returned to Senate with Amendments |
2021-03-26 | House | (H) 3rd Reading Concurred |
2021-03-26 | House | (H) Scheduled for 3rd Reading |
2021-03-25 | House | (H) 2nd Reading Concurred |
2021-03-25 | House | (H) Scheduled for 2nd Reading |
2021-03-16 | (C) Printed - New Version Available | |
2021-03-16 | House | (H) Committee Report--Bill Concurred as Amended (H) State Administration |
2021-03-15 | House | (H) Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred as Amended (H) State Administration |
2021-03-15 | (C) Amendments Available | |
2021-03-11 | House | (H) Hearing (H) State Administration |
2021-02-26 | House | (H) First Reading |
2021-02-26 | House | (H) Referred to Committee (H) State Administration |
2021-02-24 | Senate | (S) Transmitted to House |
2021-02-24 | Senate | (S) 3rd Reading Passed |
2021-02-24 | Senate | (S) Scheduled for 3rd Reading |
2021-02-23 | Senate | (S) 2nd Reading Passed |
2021-02-23 | Senate | (S) Scheduled for 2nd Reading |
2021-02-18 | Senate | (S) Committee Report--Bill Passed (S) State Administration |
2021-02-17 | Senate | (S) Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed (S) State Administration |
2021-02-15 | Senate | (S) Hearing (S) State Administration |
2021-02-15 | Senate | (S) Fiscal Note Printed |
2021-02-15 | Senate | (S) Fiscal Note Signed |
2021-02-15 | Senate | (S) Fiscal Note Received |
2021-02-08 | (C) Introduced Bill Text Available Electronically | |
2021-02-08 | Senate | (S) Referred to Committee (S) State Administration |
2021-02-08 | Senate | (S) First Reading |
2021-02-08 | Senate | (S) Fiscal Note Requested |
2021-02-08 | Senate | (S) Introduced |
2021-02-08 | (C) Draft Delivered to Requester | |
2021-02-04 | (C) Draft Ready for Delivery | |
2021-02-04 | (C) Executive Director Final Review | |
2021-02-04 | (C) Draft Ready for Delivery | |
2021-02-04 | (C) Draft in Assembly | |
2021-02-03 | (C) Executive Director Review | |
2021-02-03 | (C) Bill Draft Text Available Electronically | |
2021-02-03 | (C) Draft in Final Drafter Review | |
2021-02-02 | (C) Draft in Input/Proofing | |
2021-02-02 | (C) Draft to Drafter - Edit Review [CMD] | |
2021-02-01 | (C) Draft in Edit | |
2021-02-01 | (C) Draft in Legal Review | |
2021-01-30 | (C) Draft to Requester for Review | |
2021-01-05 | (C) Draft Request Received |