MT SB194 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 18 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-04-06 - (S) Missed Deadline for Revenue Bill Transmittal
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 18 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-04-06 - (S) Missed Deadline for Revenue Bill Transmittal
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Income tax credit for landlords who rent for below market rate
Title
Income tax credit for landlords who rent for below market rate
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-03-31 - Senate - (S) Motion Failed (Y: 19 N: 29 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-04-06 | Senate | (S) Missed Deadline for Revenue Bill Transmittal |
2023-03-31 | Senate | (S) Motion Failed |
2023-03-27 | Senate | (S) Tabled in Committee (S) Taxation |
2023-03-15 | (C) Amendments Available | |
2023-01-31 | Senate | (S) Hearing (S) Taxation |
2023-01-26 | Senate | (S) Fiscal Note Signed |
2023-01-26 | Senate | (S) Fiscal Note Printed |
2023-01-26 | Senate | (S) Fiscal Note Printed |
2023-01-25 | Senate | (S) Fiscal Note Received |
2023-01-19 | (C) Introduced Bill Text Available Electronically | |
2023-01-19 | Senate | (S) Fiscal Note Requested |
2023-01-19 | Senate | (S) First Reading |
2023-01-19 | Senate | (S) Referred to Committee (S) Taxation |
2023-01-18 | Senate | (S) Introduced |
2023-01-18 | (C) Fiscal Note Probable | |
2023-01-17 | (C) Draft Delivered to Requester | |
2023-01-17 | (C) Draft Ready for Delivery | |
2023-01-17 | (C) Executive Director Final Review | |
2023-01-17 | (C) Draft Ready for Delivery | |
2023-01-16 | (C) Draft in Assembly | |
2023-01-16 | (C) Executive Director Review | |
2023-01-16 | (C) Bill Draft Text Available Electronically | |
2023-01-16 | (C) Draft in Final Drafter Review | |
2023-01-16 | (C) Draft in Input/Proofing | |
2023-01-16 | (C) Draft to Drafter - Edit Review | |
2023-01-12 | (C) Draft in Edit | |
2023-01-11 | (C) Draft in Legal Review | |
2023-01-10 | (C) Draft On Hold | |
2023-01-07 | (C) Draft to Requester for Review | |
2022-11-29 | (C) Draft Request Received |
Subjects
Housing
Landlord and Tenant
Revenue, State
Taxation (Generally)
Taxation--Corporations
Taxation--Individual Income
Landlord and Tenant
Revenue, State
Taxation (Generally)
Taxation--Corporations
Taxation--Individual Income