MT SB162 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 6 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-06 - Chapter Number Assigned
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 6 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-06 - Chapter Number Assigned
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Transfer hail insurance program from D of Revenue to the D of Agriculture
Title
Transfer hail insurance program from D of Revenue to the D of Agriculture
Sponsors
Rep. Jim Keane [D] |
Roll Calls
2013-04-17 - Senate - (S) 3rd Reading Passed as Amended by House (Y: 49 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-16 - Senate - (S) 2nd Reading House Amendments Concurred (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-11 - House - (H) 3rd Reading Concurred (Y: 94 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2013-04-10 - House - (H) 2nd Reading Concurred (Y: 97 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2013-02-01 - Senate - (S) 3rd Reading Passed (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-31 - Senate - (S) 2nd Reading Passed (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-16 - Senate - (S) 2nd Reading House Amendments Concurred (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-11 - House - (H) 3rd Reading Concurred (Y: 94 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2013-04-10 - House - (H) 2nd Reading Concurred (Y: 97 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2013-02-01 - Senate - (S) 3rd Reading Passed (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-31 - Senate - (S) 2nd Reading Passed (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-06 | Chapter Number Assigned | |
2013-05-06 | Senate | (S) Signed by Governor |
2013-04-26 | Senate | (S) Transmitted to Governor |
2013-04-25 | House | (H) Signed by Speaker |
2013-04-24 | Senate | (S) Signed by President |
2013-04-18 | Senate | (S) Returned from Enrolling |
2013-04-18 | (C) Printed - Enrolled Version Available | |
2013-04-18 | Senate | (S) Sent to Enrolling |
2013-04-17 | Senate | (S) 3rd Reading Passed as Amended by House |
2013-04-17 | Senate | (S) Scheduled for 3rd Reading |
2013-04-16 | Senate | (S) 2nd Reading House Amendments Concurred |
2013-04-16 | Senate | (S) Scheduled for 2nd Reading |
2013-04-12 | House | (H) Returned to Senate with Amendments |
2013-04-11 | House | (H) 3rd Reading Concurred |
2013-04-11 | House | (H) Scheduled for 3rd Reading |
2013-04-10 | House | (H) 2nd Reading Concurred |
2013-04-10 | House | (H) Scheduled for 2nd Reading |
2013-04-03 | Senate | (S) Revised Fiscal Note Printed |
2013-04-02 | Senate | (S) Revised Fiscal Note Signed |
2013-04-02 | Senate | (S) Revised Fiscal Note Received |
2013-03-27 | Senate | (S) Revised Fiscal Note Requested |
2013-03-27 | (C) Printed - New Version Available | |
2013-03-27 | House | (H) Committee Report--Bill Concurred as Amended (H) Agriculture |
2013-03-26 | House | (H) Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred as Amended (H) Agriculture |
2013-03-14 | House | (H) Hearing (H) Agriculture |
2013-02-27 | House | (H) First Reading |
2013-02-27 | House | (H) Referred to Committee (H) Agriculture |
2013-02-02 | Senate | (S) Transmitted to House |
2013-02-01 | Senate | (S) 3rd Reading Passed |
2013-02-01 | Senate | (S) Scheduled for 3rd Reading |
2013-01-31 | Senate | (S) 2nd Reading Passed |
2013-01-31 | Senate | (S) Scheduled for 2nd Reading |
2013-01-29 | Senate | (S) Committee Report--Bill Passed (S) Agriculture, Livestock and Irrigation |
2013-01-28 | Senate | (S) Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed (S) Agriculture, Livestock and Irrigation |
2013-01-28 | Senate | (S) Fiscal Note Printed |
2013-01-27 | Senate | (S) Fiscal Note Received |
2013-01-24 | Senate | (S) Fiscal Note Requested |
2013-01-22 | Senate | (S) Hearing (S) Agriculture, Livestock and Irrigation |
2013-01-18 | Senate | (S) Referred to Committee (S) Agriculture, Livestock and Irrigation |
2013-01-18 | Senate | (S) First Reading |
2013-01-17 | (C) Introduced Bill Text Available Electronically | |
2013-01-17 | Senate | (S) Introduced |
2013-01-17 | (C) Draft Delivered to Requester | |
2013-01-03 | (C) Draft Ready for Delivery | |
2013-01-02 | (C) Draft in Assembly/Executive Director Review | |
2013-01-02 | (C) Draft in Final Drafter Review | |
2013-01-02 | (C) Draft in Input/Proofing | |
2013-01-02 | (C) Draft to Drafter - Edit Review [SAB] | |
2013-01-02 | (C) Draft Back for Redo | |
2012-12-21 | (C) Draft in Final Drafter Review | |
2012-12-19 | (C) Bill Draft Text Available Electronically | |
2012-12-19 | (C) Draft in Input/Proofing | |
2012-12-18 | (C) Draft to Drafter - Edit Review [SAB] | |
2012-12-18 | (C) Draft in Legal Review | |
2012-12-18 | (C) Fiscal Note Probable | |
2012-12-14 | (C) Draft to Requester for Review | |
2012-12-14 | (C) Draft Back for Requester Changes | |
2012-12-13 | (C) Draft Back for Requester Changes | |
2012-11-17 | (C) Draft Request Received |