MT SB148 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 6 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-06 - (S) Died in Process
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 6 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-06 - (S) Died in Process
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Limit lost wage and benefit award for wrongful discharge to 2 yrs from discharge
Title
Limit lost wage and benefit award for wrongful discharge to 2 yrs from discharge
Sponsors
Rep. Llew Jones [R] |
Roll Calls
2013-04-24 - Senate - (S) 3rd Reading Free Conference Committee Report Adopted (Y: 30 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-24 - House - (H) 3rd Reading Free Conference Committee Report Adopted (Y: 61 N: 39 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-23 - Senate - (S) 2nd Reading Free Conference Committee Report Adopted (Y: 30 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-23 - House - (H) 2nd Reading Free Conference Committee Report Adopted (Y: 60 N: 39 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-03-20 - House - (H) 3rd Reading Concurred (Y: 55 N: 42 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2013-03-19 - House - (H) 2nd Reading Concurred (Y: 58 N: 42 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-02 - Senate - (S) 3rd Reading Passed (Y: 29 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-01 - Senate - (S) 2nd Reading Passed (Y: 29 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-24 - House - (H) 3rd Reading Free Conference Committee Report Adopted (Y: 61 N: 39 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-23 - Senate - (S) 2nd Reading Free Conference Committee Report Adopted (Y: 30 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-23 - House - (H) 2nd Reading Free Conference Committee Report Adopted (Y: 60 N: 39 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-03-20 - House - (H) 3rd Reading Concurred (Y: 55 N: 42 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2013-03-19 - House - (H) 2nd Reading Concurred (Y: 58 N: 42 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-02 - Senate - (S) 3rd Reading Passed (Y: 29 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-01 - Senate - (S) 2nd Reading Passed (Y: 29 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-06 | Senate | (S) Died in Process |
2013-05-06 | Senate | (S) Vetoed by Governor |
2013-04-26 | Senate | (S) Transmitted to Governor |
2013-04-25 | House | (H) Signed by Speaker |
2013-04-25 | Senate | (S) Signed by President |
2013-04-24 | Senate | (S) Returned from Enrolling |
2013-04-24 | (C) Printed - Enrolled Version Available | |
2013-04-24 | Senate | (S) Sent to Enrolling |
2013-04-24 | (C) Printed - New Version Available | |
2013-04-24 | Senate | (S) 3rd Reading Free Conference Committee Report Adopted |
2013-04-24 | Senate | (S) Scheduled for 3rd Reading |
2013-04-24 | House | (H) 3rd Reading Free Conference Committee Report Adopted |
2013-04-24 | House | (H) Scheduled for 3rd Reading |
2013-04-23 | Senate | (S) 2nd Reading Free Conference Committee Report Adopted |
2013-04-23 | Senate | (S) Scheduled for 2nd Reading |
2013-04-23 | House | (H) 2nd Reading Free Conference Committee Report Adopted |
2013-04-23 | House | (H) Scheduled for 2nd Reading |
2013-04-22 | Senate | (S) Free Conference Committee Report Received |
2013-04-22 | House | (H) Free Conference Committee Report Received |
2013-04-22 | Senate | (S) Hearing (S) Free Conference |
2013-04-16 | Senate | (S) Hearing (S) Free Conference |
2013-04-15 | House | (H) Free Conference Committee Appointed |
2013-04-12 | Senate | (S) Free Conference Committee Appointed |
2013-03-28 | Senate | (S) 2nd Reading House Amendments Not Concurred |
2013-03-27 | Senate | (S) 2nd Reading Passed Consideration |
2013-03-27 | Senate | (S) Scheduled for 2nd Reading |
2013-03-26 | Senate | (S) 2nd Reading Passed Consideration |
2013-03-26 | Senate | (S) Scheduled for 2nd Reading |
2013-03-21 | House | (H) Returned to Senate with Amendments |
2013-03-20 | House | (H) 3rd Reading Concurred |
2013-03-20 | House | (H) Scheduled for 3rd Reading |
2013-03-19 | House | (H) 2nd Reading Concurred |
2013-03-19 | House | (H) Scheduled for 2nd Reading |
2013-03-15 | (C) Printed - New Version Available | |
2013-03-15 | House | (H) Committee Report--Bill Concurred as Amended (H) Business and Labor |
2013-03-15 | House | (H) Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred as Amended (H) Business and Labor |
2013-03-08 | House | (H) Hearing (H) Business and Labor |
2013-02-26 | House | (H) First Reading |
2013-02-25 | House | (H) Referred to Committee (H) Business and Labor |
2013-02-06 | Senate | (S) Revised Fiscal Note Printed |
2013-02-04 | Senate | (S) Transmitted to House |
2013-02-02 | Senate | (S) 3rd Reading Passed |
2013-02-02 | Senate | (S) Scheduled for 3rd Reading |
2013-02-01 | Senate | (S) Revised Fiscal Note Requested |
2013-02-01 | Senate | (S) 2nd Reading Passed |
2013-02-01 | Senate | (S) Scheduled for 2nd Reading |
2013-01-30 | (C) Printed - New Version Available | |
2013-01-30 | Senate | (S) Committee Report--Bill Passed as Amended (S) Business, Labor, and Economic Affairs |
2013-01-30 | Senate | (S) Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed as Amended (S) Business, Labor, and Economic Affairs |
2013-01-23 | Senate | (S) Fiscal Note Printed |
2013-01-23 | Senate | (S) Hearing (S) Business, Labor, and Economic Affairs |
2013-01-21 | Senate | (S) Fiscal Note Received |
2013-01-17 | Senate | (S) Referred to Committee (S) Business, Labor, and Economic Affairs |
2013-01-17 | Senate | (S) First Reading |
2013-01-17 | Senate | (S) Fiscal Note Requested |
2013-01-17 | (C) Introduced Bill Text Available Electronically | |
2013-01-16 | Senate | (S) Introduced |
2013-01-14 | (C) Draft Delivered to Requester | |
2013-01-10 | (C) Draft Ready for Delivery | |
2013-01-10 | (C) Draft in Assembly/Executive Director Review | |
2013-01-10 | (C) Draft in Final Drafter Review | |
2013-01-10 | (C) Bill Draft Text Available Electronically | |
2013-01-10 | (C) Draft in Input/Proofing | |
2013-01-10 | (C) Draft to Drafter - Edit Review [CMD] | |
2013-01-09 | (C) Draft in Legal Review | |
2013-01-02 | (C) Draft On Hold | |
2012-11-28 | (C) Fiscal Note Probable | |
2012-11-28 | (C) Draft to Requester for Review | |
2012-11-02 | (C) Draft Request Received |