MT SB143 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 5 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-31 - (H) 2nd Reading Not Concurred
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 5 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-31 - (H) 2nd Reading Not Concurred
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Clarify constitutional provisions and law related to board of regents/u-system
Title
Clarify constitutional provisions and law related to board of regents/u-system
Sponsors
Sen. Cary Smith [R] |
Roll Calls
2015-03-31 - House - (H) 2nd Reading Not Concurred (Y: 49 N: 51 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-03-11 - House - (H) Judiciary Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred as Amended (Y: 11 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-05 - Senate - (S) 3rd Reading Passed (Y: 26 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-02-04 - Senate - (S) 2nd Reading Passed (Y: 25 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-01-29 - Senate - (S) Judiciary Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed (Y: 7 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-11 - House - (H) Judiciary Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred as Amended (Y: 11 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-05 - Senate - (S) 3rd Reading Passed (Y: 26 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-02-04 - Senate - (S) 2nd Reading Passed (Y: 25 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-01-29 - Senate - (S) Judiciary Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed (Y: 7 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-31 | House | (H) 2nd Reading Not Concurred |
2015-03-31 | House | (H) Scheduled for 2nd Reading |
2015-03-12 | (C) Printed - New Version Available | |
2015-03-12 | House | (H) Committee Report--Bill Concurred as Amended (H) Judiciary |
2015-03-11 | House | (H) Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred as Amended (H) Judiciary |
2015-03-10 | House | (H) Hearing (H) Judiciary |
2015-02-07 | House | (H) First Reading |
2015-02-06 | House | (H) Referred to Committee (H) Judiciary |
2015-02-05 | Senate | (S) Transmitted to House |
2015-02-05 | Senate | (S) 3rd Reading Passed |
2015-02-05 | Senate | (S) Scheduled for 3rd Reading |
2015-02-04 | Senate | (S) 2nd Reading Passed |
2015-02-04 | Senate | (S) Scheduled for 2nd Reading |
2015-01-30 | (C) Legal Review Note | |
2015-01-29 | (C) Printed - New Version Available | |
2015-01-29 | (C) Sponsors Engrossed | |
2015-01-29 | Senate | (S) Committee Report--Bill Passed (S) Judiciary |
2015-01-29 | Senate | (S) Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed (S) Judiciary |
2015-01-27 | Senate | (S) Hearing (S) Judiciary |
2015-01-16 | Senate | (S) Fiscal Note Printed |
2015-01-15 | Senate | (S) Fiscal Note Signed |
2015-01-15 | Senate | (S) Fiscal Note Received |
2015-01-14 | Senate | (S) Referred to Committee (S) Judiciary |
2015-01-14 | Senate | (S) First Reading |
2015-01-13 | (C) Introduced Bill Text Available Electronically | |
2015-01-13 | Senate | (S) Fiscal Note Requested |
2015-01-13 | Senate | (S) Introduced |
2015-01-12 | (C) Draft Delivered to Requester | |
2015-01-08 | (C) Draft Ready for Delivery | |
2015-01-06 | (C) Fiscal Note Probable | |
2015-01-06 | (C) Draft in Assembly/Executive Director Review | |
2015-01-06 | (C) Draft in Final Drafter Review | |
2015-01-05 | (C) Bill Draft Text Available Electronically | |
2015-01-05 | (C) Draft in Input/Proofing | |
2015-01-05 | (C) Draft to Drafter - Edit Review [CMD] | |
2014-12-12 | (C) Draft in Legal Review | |
2014-12-10 | (C) Draft to Requester for Review | |
2014-11-05 | (C) Draft Request Received |