MT SB137 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 29 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-29 - (S) Died in Standing Committee (S) Business, Labor, and Economic Affairs
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

Establishing requirements for transparency in prescription drug costs

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Establishing requirements for transparency in prescription drug costs

Sponsors


Roll Calls


History

DateChamberAction
2021-04-29Senate(S) Died in Standing Committee (S) Business, Labor, and Economic Affairs
2021-03-02Senate(S) Missed Deadline for General Bill Transmittal
2021-02-22Senate(S) Tabled in Committee (S) Business, Labor, and Economic Affairs
2021-02-19Senate(S) Rereferred to Committee (S) Business, Labor, and Economic Affairs
2021-02-05Senate(S) Committee Report--Bill Passed as Amended (S) Business, Labor, and Economic Affairs
2021-02-05Senate(S) Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed as Amended (S) Business, Labor, and Economic Affairs
2021-02-04 (C) Amendments Available
2021-01-29Senate(S) Fiscal Note Printed
2021-01-29Senate(S) Fiscal Note Received
2021-01-29Senate(S) Hearing (S) Business, Labor, and Economic Affairs
2021-01-22Senate(S) Referred to Committee (S) Business, Labor, and Economic Affairs
2021-01-22Senate(S) First Reading
2021-01-21 (C) Introduced Bill Text Available Electronically
2021-01-21Senate(S) Fiscal Note Requested
2021-01-21Senate(S) Introduced
2021-01-21 (C) Draft Delivered to Requester
2021-01-21 (C) Draft Ready for Delivery
2021-01-21 (C) Executive Director Final Review
2021-01-21 (C) Draft Ready for Delivery
2021-01-20 (C) Draft in Assembly
2021-01-20 (C) Executive Director Review
2021-01-20 (C) Bill Draft Text Available Electronically
2021-01-20 (C) Draft in Final Drafter Review
2021-01-20 (C) Draft in Input/Proofing
2021-01-20 (C) Draft to Drafter - Edit Review [CMD]
2021-01-15 (C) Draft in Edit
2021-01-15 (C) Draft in Legal Review
2021-01-15 (C) Draft to Requester for Review
2020-07-23 (C) Draft Request Received

Subjects


Montana State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback