MT SB111 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on February 26 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-02-26 - Chapter Number Assigned
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on February 26 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-02-26 - Chapter Number Assigned
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Revising the apportionment of certain highway construction funds
Title
Revising the apportionment of certain highway construction funds
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2013-02-11 - House - (H) 3rd Reading Concurred (Y: 53 N: 45 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2013-02-09 - House - (H) 2nd Reading Concurred (Y: 74 N: 26 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-22 - Senate - (S) 3rd Reading Passed (Y: 28 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-21 - Senate - (S) 2nd Reading Passed (Y: 28 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-09 - House - (H) 2nd Reading Concurred (Y: 74 N: 26 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-22 - Senate - (S) 3rd Reading Passed (Y: 28 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-21 - Senate - (S) 2nd Reading Passed (Y: 28 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-02-26 | Chapter Number Assigned | |
2013-02-14 | Senate | (S) Transmitted to Governor |
2013-02-14 | House | (H) Signed by Speaker |
2013-02-14 | Senate | (S) Signed by President |
2013-02-14 | (C) Printed - Enrolled Version Available | |
2013-02-13 | Senate | (S) Returned from Enrolling |
2013-02-13 | Senate | (S) Sent to Enrolling |
2013-02-12 | House | (H) Returned to Senate |
2013-02-11 | House | (H) 3rd Reading Concurred |
2013-02-11 | House | (H) Scheduled for 3rd Reading |
2013-02-09 | House | (H) 2nd Reading Concurred |
2013-02-09 | House | (H) Scheduled for 2nd Reading |
2013-02-05 | House | (H) Committee Report--Bill Concurred (H) Transportation |
2013-02-05 | Senate | (S) Revised Fiscal Note Printed |
2013-02-04 | Senate | (S) Revised Fiscal Note Signed |
2013-02-04 | Senate | (S) Revised Fiscal Note Received |
2013-02-04 | House | (H) Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred (H) Transportation |
2013-02-02 | Senate | (S) Revised Fiscal Note Requested |
2013-01-30 | House | (H) Hearing (H) Transportation |
2013-01-24 | House | (H) First Reading |
2013-01-24 | House | (H) Referred to Committee (H) Transportation |
2013-01-23 | Senate | (S) Transmitted to House |
2013-01-22 | Senate | (S) 3rd Reading Passed |
2013-01-22 | Senate | (S) Scheduled for 3rd Reading |
2013-01-21 | Senate | (S) 2nd Reading Passed |
2013-01-21 | Senate | (S) Scheduled for 2nd Reading |
2013-01-18 | (C) Printed - New Version Available | |
2013-01-18 | Senate | (S) Committee Report--Bill Passed as Amended (S) Highways and Transportation |
2013-01-17 | Senate | (S) Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed as Amended (S) Highways and Transportation |
2013-01-15 | Senate | (S) Hearing (S) Highways and Transportation |
2013-01-15 | Senate | (S) Fiscal Note Printed |
2013-01-15 | Senate | (S) Fiscal Note Signed |
2013-01-14 | Senate | (S) Fiscal Note Received |
2013-01-10 | Senate | (S) First Reading |
2013-01-10 | Senate | (S) Referred to Committee (S) Highways and Transportation |
2013-01-09 | (C) Introduced Bill Text Available Electronically | |
2013-01-09 | Senate | (S) Fiscal Note Requested |
2013-01-09 | Senate | (S) Introduced |
2013-01-08 | (C) Draft Delivered to Requester | |
2012-12-21 | (C) Draft Ready for Delivery | |
2012-12-13 | (C) Fiscal Note Probable | |
2012-12-13 | (C) Draft in Assembly/Executive Director Review | |
2012-12-13 | (C) Draft in Final Drafter Review | |
2012-12-10 | (C) Bill Draft Text Available Electronically | |
2012-12-10 | (C) Draft in Input/Proofing | |
2012-12-10 | (C) Draft to Drafter - Edit Review [CMD] | |
2012-12-10 | (C) Draft in Legal Review | |
2012-12-07 | (C) Draft to Requester for Review | |
2012-12-03 | (C) Draft Back for Requester Changes | |
2012-11-08 | (C) Draft Request Received |