MT HR3 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 26 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-26 - (H) Filed with Secretary of State
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 26 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-26 - (H) Filed with Secretary of State
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Supporting permanent authorization of the Indian Health Care Improvement Act
Title
Supporting permanent authorization of the Indian Health Care Improvement Act
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-04-12 - House - (H) Resolution Adopted (Y: 89 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-31 - House - (H) Human Services Committee Executive Action--Resolution Adopted (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-31 - House - (H) Human Services Committee Executive Action--Resolution Adopted (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-26 | House | (H) Filed with Secretary of State |
2017-04-25 | House | (H) Signed by Speaker |
2017-04-20 | House | (H) Returned from Enrolling |
2017-04-19 | (C) Printed - Enrolled Version Available | |
2017-04-19 | House | (H) Sent to Enrolling |
2017-04-12 | (C) Printed - New Version Available | |
2017-04-12 | House | (H) Resolution Adopted |
2017-04-12 | House | (H) 2nd Reading Motion to Amend Carried |
2017-04-12 | House | (H) Scheduled for 2nd Reading |
2017-04-03 | (C) Sponsors Engrossed | |
2017-04-03 | (C) Printed - New Version Available | |
2017-04-01 | House | (H) Committee Report--Resolution Adopted (H) Human Services |
2017-03-31 | House | (H) Committee Executive Action--Resolution Adopted (H) Human Services |
2017-03-29 | House | (H) Hearing (H) Human Services |
2017-03-24 | (C) Introduced Bill Text Available Electronically | |
2017-03-24 | House | (H) First Reading |
2017-03-24 | House | (H) Referred to Committee (H) Human Services |
2017-03-24 | House | (H) Introduced |
2017-03-24 | (C) Draft Delivered to Requester | |
2017-03-23 | (C) Draft Ready for Delivery | |
2017-03-23 | (C) Executive Director Final Review | |
2017-03-23 | (C) Draft in Assembly | |
2017-03-23 | (C) Executive Director Review | |
2017-03-23 | (C) Bill Draft Text Available Electronically | |
2017-03-23 | (C) Draft in Final Drafter Review | |
2017-03-23 | (C) Draft in Input/Proofing | |
2017-03-23 | (C) Draft to Drafter - Edit Review [CMD] | |
2017-03-23 | (C) Draft in Edit | |
2017-03-22 | (C) Draft in Legal Review | |
2017-03-20 | (C) Draft to Requester for Review | |
2017-03-20 | (C) Draft to Requester for Review | |
2017-03-11 | (C) Draft Taken Off Hold | |
2016-10-25 | (C) Draft On Hold | |
2016-06-20 | (C) Draft Request Received |