MT HB97 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 6 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-06 - Chapter Number Assigned
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 6 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-06 - Chapter Number Assigned
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Cap highest/final average compensation in MPERA retirement systems
Title
Cap highest/final average compensation in MPERA retirement systems
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-04-24 - Senate - (S) 3rd Reading Free Conference Committee Report Adopted (Y: 48 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-23 - Senate - (S) 2nd Reading Free Conference Committee Report Adopted (Y: 47 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-22 - House - (H) 3rd Reading Free Conference Committee Report Adopted (Y: 87 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-20 - House - (H) 2nd Reading Free Conference Committee Report Adopted (Y: 88 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-09 - Senate - (S) 3rd Reading Concurred (Y: 46 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-08 - Senate - (S) 2nd Reading Concurred (Y: 47 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-03-16 - House - (H) 3rd Reading Passed (Y: 95 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2013-03-15 - House - (H) 2nd Reading Passed (Y: 99 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-23 - Senate - (S) 2nd Reading Free Conference Committee Report Adopted (Y: 47 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-22 - House - (H) 3rd Reading Free Conference Committee Report Adopted (Y: 87 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-20 - House - (H) 2nd Reading Free Conference Committee Report Adopted (Y: 88 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-09 - Senate - (S) 3rd Reading Concurred (Y: 46 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-08 - Senate - (S) 2nd Reading Concurred (Y: 47 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-03-16 - House - (H) 3rd Reading Passed (Y: 95 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2013-03-15 - House - (H) 2nd Reading Passed (Y: 99 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-06 | Chapter Number Assigned | |
2013-05-06 | House | (H) Signed by Governor |
2013-04-26 | House | (H) Transmitted to Governor |
2013-04-25 | House | (H) Signed by Speaker |
2013-04-25 | Senate | (S) Signed by President |
2013-04-25 | House | (H) Returned from Enrolling |
2013-04-25 | (C) Printed - Enrolled Version Available | |
2013-04-25 | House | (H) Sent to Enrolling |
2013-04-24 | (C) Printed - New Version Available | |
2013-04-24 | Senate | (S) 3rd Reading Free Conference Committee Report Adopted |
2013-04-24 | House | (H) Sent to Enrolling |
2013-04-24 | Senate | (S) Scheduled for 3rd Reading |
2013-04-23 | Senate | (S) 2nd Reading Free Conference Committee Report Adopted |
2013-04-23 | Senate | (S) Scheduled for 2nd Reading |
2013-04-22 | House | (H) 3rd Reading Free Conference Committee Report Adopted |
2013-04-22 | House | (H) Scheduled for 3rd Reading |
2013-04-20 | House | (H) 2nd Reading Free Conference Committee Report Adopted |
2013-04-20 | Senate | (S) Free Conference Committee Report Received |
2013-04-20 | House | (H) Scheduled for 2nd Reading |
2013-04-19 | House | (H) Free Conference Committee Report Received |
2013-04-19 | Senate | (S) Hearing (S) Free Conference |
2013-04-18 | Senate | (S) Free Conference Committee Appointed |
2013-04-15 | House | (H) Free Conference Committee Appointed |
2013-04-15 | House | (H) 2nd Reading Senate Amendments Not Concurred |
2013-04-15 | House | (H) Scheduled for 2nd Reading |
2013-04-10 | Senate | (S) Returned to House with Amendments |
2013-04-09 | Senate | (S) 3rd Reading Concurred |
2013-04-09 | Senate | (S) Scheduled for 3rd Reading |
2013-04-08 | Senate | (S) 2nd Reading Concurred |
2013-04-08 | Senate | (S) Scheduled for 2nd Reading |
2013-04-04 | (C) Printed - New Version Available | |
2013-04-04 | Senate | (S) Committee Report--Bill Concurred as Amended (S) Finance and Claims |
2013-04-03 | Senate | (S) Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred as Amended (S) Finance and Claims |
2013-03-25 | Senate | (S) Hearing (S) Finance and Claims |
2013-03-20 | Senate | (S) Referred to Committee (S) Finance and Claims |
2013-03-20 | Senate | (S) First Reading |
2013-03-18 | House | (H) Transmitted to Senate |
2013-03-16 | House | (H) 3rd Reading Passed |
2013-03-16 | House | (H) Scheduled for 3rd Reading |
2013-03-15 | House | (H) 2nd Reading Passed |
2013-03-15 | House | (H) Scheduled for 2nd Reading |
2013-03-12 | House | (H) Committee Report--Bill Passed (H) Joint Select Committee on Pensions |
2013-03-12 | House | (H) Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed (H) Joint Select Committee on Pensions |
2013-03-05 | House | (H) Hearing (H) Joint Select Committee on Pensions |
2013-02-18 | House | (H) Rereferred to Committee (H) Joint Select Committee on Pensions |
2013-02-15 | House | (H) Committee Report--Bill Passed (H) State Administration |
2013-02-15 | House | (H) Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed (H) State Administration |
2013-02-04 | House | (H) Hearing (H) State Administration |
2013-01-25 | House | (H) Hearing Canceled (H) State Administration |
2013-01-23 | House | (H) Rereferred to Committee (H) State Administration |
2013-01-18 | House | (H) Rereferred to Committee (H) Joint Select Committee on Pensions |
2013-01-11 | House | (H) Fiscal Note Printed |
2013-01-09 | House | (H) Fiscal Note Signed |
2013-01-08 | House | (H) Fiscal Note Received |
2013-01-07 | House | (H) First Reading |
2012-12-21 | House | (H) Referred to Committee (H) State Administration |
2012-12-17 | House | (H) Fiscal Note Requested |
2012-12-12 | (C) Introduced Bill Text Available Electronically | |
2012-12-12 | House | (H) Introduced |
2012-12-10 | (C) Pre-Introduction Letter Sent | |
2012-12-10 | (C) Draft in Assembly/Executive Director Review | |
2012-12-06 | (C) Draft in Final Drafter Review | |
2012-12-06 | (C) Bill Draft Text Available Electronically | |
2012-12-06 | (C) Draft in Input/Proofing | |
2012-12-06 | (C) Draft to Drafter - Edit Review [SAB] | |
2012-12-03 | (C) Draft in Legal Review | |
2012-12-03 | (C) Draft to Requester for Review | |
2012-11-19 | (C) Draft to Requester for Review | |
2012-06-26 | (C) Draft Request Received |