LA HB295 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on June 25 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-06-25 - Effective date: See Act.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on June 25 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-06-25 - Effective date: See Act.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Creates the Shreveport I-20 Economic Development District
Title
Creates the Shreveport I-20 Economic Development District
Sponsors
Rep. Steven Jackson [D] | Sen. Heather Cloud [R] | Sen. Katrina Jackson-Andrews [D] | Sen. Samuel Jenkins [D] |
Roll Calls
2024-05-30 - House - House Vote on HB 295 CONCUR IN SENATE AMENDMENTS (#1658) (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2024-05-29 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 295 CO-AUTHORS (#1303) (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 36) [PASS]
2024-05-29 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 295 FINAL PASSAGE (#1302) (Y: 33 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2024-04-11 - House - House Vote on HB 295 FINAL PASSAGE (#438) (Y: 86 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2024-05-29 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 295 CO-AUTHORS (#1303) (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 36) [PASS]
2024-05-29 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 295 FINAL PASSAGE (#1302) (Y: 33 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2024-04-11 - House - House Vote on HB 295 FINAL PASSAGE (#438) (Y: 86 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-06-25 | House | Effective date: See Act. |
2024-06-25 | House | Becomes Act No. 783 without the Governor's signature. |
2024-06-04 | House | Sent to the Governor for executive approval. |
2024-06-02 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate. |
2024-05-31 | House | Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2024-05-30 | House | Read by title, roll called, yeas 92, nays 0, Senate amendments concurred in. |
2024-05-30 | House | Scheduled for concurrence on 05/30/2024. |
2024-05-30 | House | Rules suspended. |
2024-05-30 | House | Received from the Senate with amendments. |
2024-05-29 | Senate | Rules suspended. Senate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title, passed by a vote of 33 yeas and 2 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. |
2024-05-28 | House | Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2024-05-28 | Senate | Reported with Legislative Bureau amendments which were read and adopted. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage. |
2024-05-23 | Senate | Committee amendments read and adopted. Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau. |
2024-05-22 | Senate | Reported with amendments. |
2024-04-16 | Senate | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Local and Municipal Affairs. |
2024-04-15 | Senate | Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |
2024-04-11 | House | Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 86, nays 7. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate. |
2024-04-09 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 04/11/2024. |
2024-04-09 | House | Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. |
2024-04-08 | House | Reported favorably (15-0). |
2024-03-11 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Municipal, Parochial and Cultural Affairs. |
2024-02-28 | House | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Municipal, Parochial and Cultural Affairs. |
2024-02-28 | House | Prefiled. |