MT HB967 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 28 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-04-06 - (H) Missed Deadline for Revenue Bill Transmittal
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 28 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-04-06 - (H) Missed Deadline for Revenue Bill Transmittal
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Create child care subtrust
Title
Create child care subtrust
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-04-03 - House - (H) 2nd Reading Not Passed (Y: 40 N: 60 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2023-03-30 - House - (H) Taxation Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed as Amended (Y: 13 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-30 - House - (H) Taxation Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed as Amended (Y: 13 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-04-06 | House | (H) Missed Deadline for Revenue Bill Transmittal |
2023-04-05 | House | (H) Revised Fiscal Note Printed |
2023-04-05 | House | (H) Fiscal Note Unsigned |
2023-04-04 | House | (H) Revised Fiscal Note Received |
2023-04-03 | House | (H) Revised Fiscal Note Requested |
2023-04-03 | House | (H) 2nd Reading Not Passed |
2023-04-03 | House | (H) Scheduled for 2nd Reading |
2023-03-30 | House | (H) Committee Report--Bill Passed as Amended (H) Taxation |
2023-03-30 | House | (H) Fiscal Note Printed |
2023-03-30 | House | (H) Fiscal Note Signed |
2023-03-30 | House | (H) Fiscal Note Received |
2023-03-30 | (C) Printed - New Version Available | |
2023-03-30 | House | (H) Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed as Amended (H) Taxation |
2023-03-30 | House | (H) Hearing (H) Taxation |
2023-03-29 | (C) Amendments Available | |
2023-03-29 | House | (H) Fiscal Note Requested |
2023-03-29 | (C) Introduced Bill Text Available Electronically | |
2023-03-29 | House | (H) First Reading |
2023-03-29 | House | (H) Referred to Committee (H) Taxation |
2023-03-28 | House | (H) Introduced |
2023-03-28 | (C) Fiscal Note Probable | |
2023-03-28 | (C) Draft Delivered to Requester | |
2023-03-14 | (C) Draft Ready for Delivery | |
2023-03-14 | (C) Executive Director Final Review | |
2023-03-14 | (C) Draft Ready for Delivery | |
2023-03-14 | (C) Draft in Assembly | |
2023-03-14 | (C) Executive Director Review | |
2023-03-13 | (C) Bill Draft Text Available Electronically | |
2023-03-13 | (C) Draft in Final Drafter Review | |
2023-03-11 | (C) Draft in Input/Proofing | |
2023-03-11 | (C) Draft to Drafter - Edit Review | |
2023-03-09 | (C) Draft in Edit | |
2023-03-09 | (C) Draft in Legal Review | |
2023-03-03 | (C) Draft to Requester for Review | |
2023-02-24 | (C) Draft to Requester for Review | |
2023-02-16 | (C) Draft Taken Off Hold | |
2022-12-04 | (C) Draft On Hold | |
2022-12-03 | (C) Draft Request Received |