MT HB670 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 29 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-29 - (S) Died in Standing Committee (S) Select Committee on Marijuana Law
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 29 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-29 - (S) Died in Standing Committee (S) Select Committee on Marijuana Law
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Generally revise laws to implement recreational marijuana program
Title
Generally revise laws to implement recreational marijuana program
Sponsors
Rep. Derek Skees [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-04-08 - House - (H) 3rd Reading Passed (Y: 66 N: 33 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-04-07 - House - (H) Appropriations Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed (Y: 17 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-06 - House - (H) 2nd Reading Motion to Amend Failed (Y: 33 N: 67 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-04-06 - House - (H) 2nd Reading Motion to Amend Carried (Y: 66 N: 34 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-06 - House - (H) 2nd Reading Motion to Amend Carried (Y: 93 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-06 - House - (H) 2nd Reading Passed as Amended (Y: 67 N: 33 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-01 - House - (H) Business and Labor Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed (Y: 11 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-07 - House - (H) Appropriations Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed (Y: 17 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-06 - House - (H) 2nd Reading Motion to Amend Failed (Y: 33 N: 67 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-04-06 - House - (H) 2nd Reading Motion to Amend Carried (Y: 66 N: 34 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-06 - House - (H) 2nd Reading Motion to Amend Carried (Y: 93 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-06 - House - (H) 2nd Reading Passed as Amended (Y: 67 N: 33 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-01 - House - (H) Business and Labor Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed (Y: 11 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-29 | Senate | (S) Died in Standing Committee (S) Select Committee on Marijuana Law |
2021-04-19 | Senate | (S) Tabled in Committee (S) Select Committee on Marijuana Law |
2021-04-14 | House | (H) Revised Fiscal Note Printed |
2021-04-13 | (C) Fiscal Note Unsigned | |
2021-04-12 | Senate | (S) Hearing (S) Select Committee on Marijuana Law |
2021-04-12 | House | (H) Revised Fiscal Note Received |
2021-04-09 | Senate | (S) Referred to Committee (S) Select Committee on Marijuana Law |
2021-04-09 | Senate | (S) First Reading |
2021-04-08 | House | (H) Transmitted to Senate |
2021-04-08 | House | (H) 3rd Reading Passed |
2021-04-08 | House | (H) Scheduled for 3rd Reading |
2021-04-07 | House | (H) Revised Fiscal Note Requested |
2021-04-07 | House | (H) Revised Fiscal Note Printed |
2021-04-07 | House | (H) Committee Report--Bill Passed (H) Appropriations |
2021-04-07 | House | (H) Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed (H) Appropriations |
2021-04-07 | (C) Fiscal Note Unsigned | |
2021-04-07 | House | (H) Hearing (H) Appropriations |
2021-04-06 | (C) Printed - New Version Available | |
2021-04-06 | House | (H) Rereferred to Committee (H) Appropriations |
2021-04-06 | House | (H) 2nd Reading Passed as Amended |
2021-04-06 | House | (H) 2nd Reading Motion to Amend Failed |
2021-04-06 | House | (H) 2nd Reading Motion to Amend Carried |
2021-04-06 | House | (H) 2nd Reading Motion to Amend Carried |
2021-04-06 | House | (H) Scheduled for 2nd Reading |
2021-04-06 | House | (H) Revised Fiscal Note Received |
2021-04-06 | House | (H) Revised Fiscal Note Requested |
2021-04-02 | (C) Amendments Available | |
2021-04-01 | House | (H) Committee Report--Bill Passed (H) Business and Labor |
2021-04-01 | House | (H) Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed (H) Business and Labor |
2021-04-01 | House | (H) Fiscal Note Printed |
2021-04-01 | (C) Fiscal Note Unsigned | |
2021-04-01 | House | (H) Hearing (H) Taxation |
2021-03-31 | House | (H) Fiscal Note Received |
2021-03-30 | House | (H) Hearing (H) Business and Labor |
2021-03-24 | House | (H) First Reading |
2021-03-24 | House | (H) Referred to Committee (H) Business and Labor |
2021-03-23 | (C) Introduced Bill Text Available Electronically | |
2021-03-23 | House | (H) Fiscal Note Requested |
2021-03-23 | House | (H) Introduced |
2021-03-23 | (C) Draft Delivered to Requester | |
2021-03-22 | (C) Draft Ready for Delivery | |
2021-03-22 | (C) Executive Director Final Review | |
2021-03-22 | (C) Draft Ready for Delivery | |
2021-03-21 | (C) Draft in Assembly | |
2021-03-20 | (C) Executive Director Review | |
2021-03-19 | (C) Bill Draft Text Available Electronically | |
2021-03-19 | (C) Draft in Final Drafter Review | |
2021-03-19 | (C) Draft in Input/Proofing | |
2021-03-19 | (C) Bill Draft Text Available Electronically | |
2021-03-19 | (C) Draft in Final Drafter Review | |
2021-03-19 | (C) Draft in Input/Proofing | |
2021-03-19 | (C) Bill Draft Text Available Electronically | |
2021-03-19 | (C) Draft in Final Drafter Review | |
2021-03-18 | (C) Draft in Input/Proofing | |
2021-03-18 | (C) Draft to Drafter - Edit Review [CMD] | |
2021-03-17 | (C) Draft in Edit | |
2021-03-16 | (C) Draft in Legal Review | |
2021-03-16 | (C) Draft to Requester for Review | |
2020-12-03 | (C) Draft Request Received |
Subjects
Alcohol and Drugs
Appropriations
Elections
Legislature
Local Government
Revenue, State
Rule Making
Taxation (Generally)
Appropriations
Elections
Legislature
Local Government
Revenue, State
Rule Making
Taxation (Generally)