MT HB640 | 2009 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 28 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-04-28 - (H) Died in Standing Committee  
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 28 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-04-28 - (H) Died in Standing Committee  
Summary
Limit deduction of qualified residential interest to fund Housing Montana fund
Title
Limit deduction of qualified residential interest to fund Housing Montana fund
Sponsors
Rep. Art Noonan [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-04-28 | (H) Died in Standing Committee   | |
2009-03-31 | (H) Missed Deadline for Revenue Bill Transmittal   | |
2009-03-19 | (H) Committee Vote Failed; Remains in Committee (H) Taxation | |
2009-03-11 | (H) Fiscal Note Printed   | |
2009-03-11 | (H) Hearing (H) Taxation | |
2009-03-11 | (H) Fiscal Note Received   | |
2009-03-04 | (C) Introduced Bill Text Available Electronically   | |
2009-03-04 | (H) First Reading   | |
2009-03-04 | (H) Referred to Committee (H) Taxation | |
2009-03-04 | (H) Fiscal Note Requested   | |
2009-03-04 | (H) Introduced   | |
2009-03-02 | (C) Draft Delivered to Requester   | |
2009-02-16 | (C) Draft Ready for Delivery   | |
2009-02-16 | (C) Fiscal Note Probable   | |
2009-02-16 | (C) Draft in Assembly/Executive Director Review   | |
2009-02-16 | (C) Draft in Final Drafter Review   | |
2009-02-16 | (C) Bill Draft Text Available Electronically   | |
2009-02-16 | (C) Draft in Input/Proofing   | |
2009-02-16 | (C) Draft to Drafter - Edit Review [SAB]   | |
2009-02-16 | (C) Draft in Edit   | |
2009-02-16 | (C) Draft in Legal Review   | |
2009-02-11 | (C) Draft to Requester for Review   | |
2009-01-19 | (C) Draft On Hold   | |
2009-01-13 | (C) Draft Request Received   |
Subjects
Montana State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://laws.leg.mt.gov/laws09/LAW0210W$BSIV.ActionQuery?P_BILL_NO1=640&P_BLTP_BILL_TYP_CD=HB&Z_ACTION=Find |