MT HB57 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 18 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-18 - Chapter Number Assigned
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 18 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-18 - Chapter Number Assigned
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Clarify placement of definitions in water law
Title
Clarify placement of definitions in water law
Sponsors
Rep. Zach Brown [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-02-22 - Senate - (S) 3rd Reading Concurred (Y: 41 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-21 - Senate - (S) 2nd Reading Concurred (Y: 44 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-18 - Senate - (S) Natural Resources Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-08 - House - (H) 3rd Reading Passed (Y: 85 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-07 - House - (H) 2nd Reading Passed (Y: 91 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-04 - House - (H) Natural Resources Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-21 - Senate - (S) 2nd Reading Concurred (Y: 44 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-18 - Senate - (S) Natural Resources Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-08 - House - (H) 3rd Reading Passed (Y: 85 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-07 - House - (H) 2nd Reading Passed (Y: 91 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-04 - House - (H) Natural Resources Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-18 | Chapter Number Assigned | |
2019-03-18 | House | (H) Signed by Governor |
2019-03-12 | House | (H) Transmitted to Governor |
2019-03-11 | Senate | (S) Signed by President |
2019-02-27 | House | (H) Signed by Speaker |
2019-02-26 | (C) Printed - Enrolled Version Available | |
2019-02-26 | House | (H) Returned from Enrolling |
2019-02-25 | House | (H) Sent to Enrolling |
2019-02-22 | Senate | (S) Returned to House |
2019-02-22 | Senate | (S) 3rd Reading Concurred |
2019-02-22 | Senate | (S) Scheduled for 3rd Reading |
2019-02-21 | Senate | (S) 2nd Reading Concurred |
2019-02-21 | Senate | (S) Scheduled for 2nd Reading |
2019-02-19 | Senate | (S) Committee Report--Bill Concurred (S) Natural Resources |
2019-02-18 | Senate | (S) Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred (S) Natural Resources |
2019-02-18 | Senate | (S) Hearing (S) Natural Resources |
2019-02-11 | Senate | (S) Referred to Committee (S) Natural Resources |
2019-02-11 | Senate | (S) First Reading |
2019-02-08 | House | (H) Transmitted to Senate |
2019-02-08 | House | (H) 3rd Reading Passed |
2019-02-08 | House | (H) Scheduled for 3rd Reading |
2019-02-07 | House | (H) 2nd Reading Passed |
2019-02-07 | House | (H) Scheduled for 2nd Reading |
2019-02-05 | House | (H) Committee Report--Bill Passed (H) Natural Resources |
2019-02-04 | House | (H) Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed (H) Natural Resources |
2019-01-23 | House | (H) Hearing (H) Natural Resources |
2019-01-07 | House | (H) First Reading (H) Natural Resources |
2018-12-15 | House | (H) Referred to Committee (H) Natural Resources |
2018-12-11 | (C) Introduced Bill Text Available Electronically | |
2018-12-11 | House | (H) Introduced |
2018-12-06 | (C) Pre-Introduction Letter Sent | |
2018-12-05 | (C) Draft in Assembly | |
2018-12-04 | (C) Executive Director Review | |
2018-12-04 | (C) Bill Draft Text Available Electronically | |
2018-12-04 | (C) Draft in Final Drafter Review | |
2018-12-03 | (C) Draft in Input/Proofing | |
2018-12-03 | (C) Draft to Drafter - Edit Review [SMH] | |
2018-11-30 | (C) Draft in Edit | |
2018-11-29 | (C) Draft in Legal Review | |
2018-11-29 | (C) Draft to Requester for Review | |
2018-09-20 | (C) Draft Request Received |