MT HB566 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 28 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-28 - (S) Died in Standing Committee (S) State Administration
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 28 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-28 - (S) Died in Standing Committee (S) State Administration
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Constitutional amendment revising selection of redistricting commission
Title
Constitutional amendment revising selection of redistricting commission
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-03-30 - House - (H) 3rd Reading Passed (Y: 57 N: 42 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-03-28 - House - (H) 2nd Reading Passed (Y: 59 N: 41 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-24 - House - (H) State Administration Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed as Amended (Y: 12 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-28 - House - (H) 2nd Reading Passed (Y: 59 N: 41 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-24 - House - (H) State Administration Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed as Amended (Y: 12 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-28 | Senate | (S) Died in Standing Committee (S) State Administration |
2015-04-17 | Senate | (S) Tabled in Committee (S) State Administration |
2015-04-17 | Senate | (S) Hearing (S) State Administration |
2015-04-01 | Senate | (S) Referred to Committee (S) State Administration |
2015-04-01 | Senate | (S) First Reading |
2015-03-31 | House | (H) Transmitted to Senate |
2015-03-30 | House | (H) 3rd Reading Passed |
2015-03-30 | House | (H) Scheduled for 3rd Reading |
2015-03-28 | House | (H) 2nd Reading Passed |
2015-03-28 | House | (H) Scheduled for 2nd Reading |
2015-03-24 | (C) Printed - New Version Available | |
2015-03-24 | House | (H) Committee Report--Bill Passed as Amended (H) State Administration |
2015-03-24 | House | (H) Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed as Amended (H) State Administration |
2015-03-17 | House | (H) Hearing (H) State Administration |
2015-03-10 | House | (H) Hearing Canceled (H) State Administration |
2015-02-26 | House | (H) Fiscal Note Printed |
2015-02-25 | House | (H) Fiscal Note Signed |
2015-02-25 | House | (H) Fiscal Note Received |
2015-02-23 | House | (H) Fiscal Note Requested |
2015-02-19 | (C) Introduced Bill Text Available Electronically | |
2015-02-18 | House | (H) First Reading |
2015-02-18 | House | (H) Referred to Committee (H) State Administration |
2015-02-18 | House | (H) Introduced |
2015-02-18 | (C) Draft Delivered to Requester | |
2015-02-11 | (C) Draft Ready for Delivery | |
2015-02-11 | (C) Draft in Assembly/Executive Director Review | |
2015-02-11 | (C) Draft in Final Drafter Review | |
2015-02-11 | (C) Draft to Drafter - Edit Review [KWK] | |
2015-02-10 | (C) Draft in Legal Review | |
2015-02-10 | (C) Draft Back for Redo | |
2015-02-10 | (C) Draft Taken by Drafter | |
2015-02-10 | (C) Draft in Assembly/Executive Director Review | |
2015-02-10 | (C) Draft in Final Drafter Review | |
2015-02-10 | (C) Bill Draft Text Available Electronically | |
2015-02-10 | (C) Draft in Input/Proofing | |
2015-02-09 | (C) Draft to Drafter - Edit Review [KWK] | |
2015-02-09 | (C) Draft in Legal Review | |
2015-02-05 | (C) Draft to Requester for Review | |
2015-01-20 | (C) Draft Request Received |