MT HB559 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 5 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-05 - Chapter Number Assigned
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 5 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-05 - Chapter Number Assigned
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Promote Montana Indian languages
Title
Promote Montana Indian languages
Sponsors
Rep. George Kipp [D] |
Roll Calls
2015-04-21 - Senate - (S) 3rd Reading Concurred (Y: 37 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-20 - Senate - (S) 2nd Reading Concurred (Y: 40 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-16 - Senate - (S) Finance and Claims Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred (Y: 15 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-13 - Senate - (S) Education and Cultural Resources Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-30 - House - (H) 3rd Reading Passed (Y: 77 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-03-28 - House - (H) 2nd Reading Passed (Y: 78 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-27 - House - (H) Appropriations Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed as Amended (Y: 18 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-25 - House - (H) 2nd Reading Passed (Y: 71 N: 29 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-20 - House - (H) Federal Relations, Energy, and Telecommunications Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed (Y: 11 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-20 - Senate - (S) 2nd Reading Concurred (Y: 40 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-16 - Senate - (S) Finance and Claims Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred (Y: 15 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-13 - Senate - (S) Education and Cultural Resources Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-30 - House - (H) 3rd Reading Passed (Y: 77 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-03-28 - House - (H) 2nd Reading Passed (Y: 78 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-27 - House - (H) Appropriations Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed as Amended (Y: 18 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-25 - House - (H) 2nd Reading Passed (Y: 71 N: 29 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-20 - House - (H) Federal Relations, Energy, and Telecommunications Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed (Y: 11 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-05 | Chapter Number Assigned | |
2015-05-05 | House | (H) Signed by Governor |
2015-04-25 | House | (H) Transmitted to Governor |
2015-04-25 | Senate | (S) Signed by President |
2015-04-24 | House | (H) Signed by Speaker |
2015-04-22 | House | (H) Returned from Enrolling |
2015-04-22 | (C) Printed - Enrolled Version Available | |
2015-04-21 | House | (H) Sent to Enrolling |
2015-04-21 | Senate | (S) Returned to House |
2015-04-21 | Senate | (S) 3rd Reading Concurred |
2015-04-21 | Senate | (S) Scheduled for 3rd Reading |
2015-04-20 | Senate | (S) 2nd Reading Concurred |
2015-04-20 | Senate | (S) Scheduled for 2nd Reading |
2015-04-16 | Senate | (S) Committee Report--Bill Concurred (S) Finance and Claims |
2015-04-16 | Senate | (S) Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred (S) Finance and Claims |
2015-04-16 | Senate | (S) Hearing (S) Finance and Claims |
2015-04-15 | Senate | (S) Rereferred to Committee (S) Finance and Claims |
2015-04-14 | Senate | (S) Committee Report--Bill Concurred (S) Education and Cultural Resources |
2015-04-13 | Senate | (S) Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred (S) Education and Cultural Resources |
2015-04-13 | Senate | (S) Hearing (S) Education and Cultural Resources |
2015-04-01 | Senate | (S) Referred to Committee (S) Education and Cultural Resources |
2015-04-01 | Senate | (S) First Reading |
2015-03-31 | House | (H) Transmitted to Senate |
2015-03-30 | House | (H) 3rd Reading Passed |
2015-03-30 | House | (H) Scheduled for 3rd Reading |
2015-03-28 | House | (H) 2nd Reading Passed |
2015-03-28 | House | (H) Scheduled for 2nd Reading |
2015-03-27 | (C) Printed - New Version Available | |
2015-03-27 | House | (H) Committee Report--Bill Passed as Amended (H) Appropriations |
2015-03-27 | House | (H) Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed as Amended (H) Appropriations |
2015-03-26 | House | (H) Hearing (H) Appropriations |
2015-03-25 | House | (H) Rereferred to Committee (H) Appropriations |
2015-03-25 | House | (H) 2nd Reading Passed |
2015-03-25 | House | (H) Scheduled for 2nd Reading |
2015-03-23 | (C) Printed - New Version Available | |
2015-03-23 | (C) Sponsors Engrossed | |
2015-03-23 | House | (H) Committee Report--Bill Passed (H) Federal Relations, Energy, and Telecommunications |
2015-03-20 | House | (H) Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed (H) Federal Relations, Energy, and Telecommunications |
2015-03-06 | House | (H) Hearing (H) Federal Relations, Energy, and Telecommunications |
2015-03-05 | House | (H) Fiscal Note Printed |
2015-03-05 | House | (H) Fiscal Note Signed |
2015-03-05 | House | (H) Fiscal Note Received |
2015-02-23 | House | (H) Fiscal Note Requested |
2015-02-19 | (C) Introduced Bill Text Available Electronically | |
2015-02-19 | House | (H) Hearing Canceled (H) Federal Relations, Energy, and Telecommunications |
2015-02-19 | House | (H) Hearing Canceled (H) Federal Relations, Energy, and Telecommunications |
2015-02-18 | House | (H) First Reading |
2015-02-18 | House | (H) Referred to Committee (H) Federal Relations, Energy, and Telecommunications |
2015-02-18 | House | (H) Introduced |
2015-02-17 | (C) Draft Delivered to Requester | |
2015-02-13 | (C) Draft Ready for Delivery | |
2015-02-13 | (C) Draft in Assembly/Executive Director Review | |
2015-02-13 | (C) Draft in Final Drafter Review | |
2015-02-13 | (C) Bill Draft Text Available Electronically | |
2015-02-13 | (C) Draft in Input/Proofing | |
2015-02-12 | (C) Draft to Drafter - Edit Review [CMD] | |
2015-02-11 | (C) Draft in Legal Review | |
2015-02-05 | (C) Draft to Requester for Review | |
2015-02-04 | (C) Draft Taken Off Hold | |
2014-10-13 | (C) Draft On Hold | |
2014-09-22 | (C) Draft Request Received |