MT HB553 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 24 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-24 - (S) Died in Standing Committee (S) Natural Resources
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 24 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-24 - (S) Died in Standing Committee (S) Natural Resources
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Generally revise gravel permit permitting process
Title
Generally revise gravel permit permitting process
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-02-27 - House - (H) 3rd Reading Passed (Y: 60 N: 38 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2013-02-26 - House - (H) 2nd Reading Passed as Amended (Y: 62 N: 38 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-26 - House - (H) 2nd Reading Passed as Amended (Y: 62 N: 38 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-04-24 | Senate | (S) Died in Standing Committee (S) Natural Resources |
2013-03-22 | Senate | (S) Tabled in Committee (S) Natural Resources |
2013-03-20 | Senate | (S) Hearing (S) Natural Resources |
2013-03-13 | House | (H) Fiscal Note Printed |
2013-03-12 | House | (H) Fiscal Note Signed |
2013-03-12 | House | (H) Fiscal Note Received |
2013-03-08 | Senate | (S) Referred to Committee (S) Natural Resources |
2013-03-08 | Senate | (S) First Reading |
2013-03-06 | House | (H) Fiscal Note Requested |
2013-02-27 | House | (H) Transmitted to Senate |
2013-02-27 | House | (H) 3rd Reading Passed |
2013-02-27 | House | (H) Scheduled for 3rd Reading |
2013-02-26 | (C) Printed - New Version Available | |
2013-02-26 | House | (H) 2nd Reading Passed as Amended |
2013-02-26 | House | (H) 2nd Reading Motion to Amend Carried |
2013-02-26 | House | (H) Scheduled for 2nd Reading |
2013-02-23 | House | (H) Committee Report--Bill Passed (H) Natural Resources |
2013-02-22 | House | (H) Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed (H) Natural Resources |
2013-02-22 | House | (H) Hearing (H) Natural Resources |
2013-02-20 | House | (H) First Reading |
2013-02-20 | House | (H) Referred to Committee (H) Natural Resources |
2013-02-20 | (C) Introduced Bill Text Available Electronically | |
2013-02-19 | House | (H) Introduced |
2013-02-18 | (C) Draft Delivered to Requester | |
2013-02-16 | (C) Draft Ready for Delivery | |
2013-02-16 | (C) Draft in Assembly/Executive Director Review | |
2013-02-15 | (C) Draft in Final Drafter Review | |
2013-02-15 | (C) Bill Draft Text Available Electronically | |
2013-02-15 | (C) Draft in Input/Proofing | |
2013-02-15 | (C) Draft to Drafter - Edit Review [JLN] | |
2013-02-14 | (C) Draft in Legal Review | |
2013-02-13 | (C) Draft to Requester for Review | |
2013-02-11 | (C) Draft to Requester for Review | |
2013-02-11 | (C) Draft Taken Off Hold | |
2012-12-11 | (C) Draft On Hold | |
2012-12-04 | (C) Draft Request Received |