MT HB546 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 8 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-08 - (S) Died in Standing Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 8 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-08 - (S) Died in Standing Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Authorize additional funding for coal trust loan program for housing
Title
Authorize additional funding for coal trust loan program for housing
Sponsors
Rep. Dave Fern [D] |
Roll Calls
2023-03-20 - House - (H) 3rd Reading Passed (Y: 65 N: 33 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-03-17 - House - (H) 2nd Reading Passed (Y: 75 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-03-15 - House - (H) Appropriations Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed as Amended (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-01 - House - (H) 2nd Reading Passed (Y: 91 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-27 - House - (H) Taxation Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed as Amended (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-17 - House - (H) 2nd Reading Passed (Y: 75 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-03-15 - House - (H) Appropriations Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed as Amended (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-01 - House - (H) 2nd Reading Passed (Y: 91 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-27 - House - (H) Taxation Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed as Amended (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-08 | Senate | (S) Died in Standing Committee |
2023-04-19 | Senate | (S) Tabled in Committee (S) Business, Labor, and Economic Affairs |
2023-04-04 | Senate | (S) Hearing (S) Business, Labor, and Economic Affairs |
2023-03-22 | House | (H) Revised Fiscal Note Printed |
2023-03-21 | House | (H) Fiscal Note Unsigned |
2023-03-21 | Senate | (S) First Reading |
2023-03-21 | Senate | (S) Referred to Committee (S) Business, Labor, and Economic Affairs |
2023-03-21 | House | (H) Transmitted to Senate |
2023-03-20 | House | (H) 3rd Reading Passed |
2023-03-20 | House | (H) Scheduled for 3rd Reading |
2023-03-20 | House | (H) Revised Fiscal Note Received |
2023-03-17 | House | (H) 2nd Reading Passed |
2023-03-17 | House | (H) Scheduled for 2nd Reading |
2023-03-16 | House | (H) Revised Fiscal Note Requested |
2023-03-16 | House | (H) Committee Report--Bill Passed as Amended (H) Appropriations |
2023-03-16 | House | (H) Revised Fiscal Note Printed |
2023-03-16 | House | (H) Fiscal Note Unsigned |
2023-03-16 | (C) Printed - New Version Available | |
2023-03-15 | House | (H) Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed as Amended (H) Appropriations |
2023-03-15 | House | (H) Revised Fiscal Note Received |
2023-03-15 | House | (H) Hearing (H) Appropriations |
2023-03-14 | House | (H) Revised Fiscal Note Requested |
2023-03-01 | House | (H) Rereferred to Committee (H) Appropriations |
2023-03-01 | House | (H) 2nd Reading Passed |
2023-02-28 | (C) Printed - New Version Available | |
2023-02-27 | House | (H) Committee Report--Bill Passed as Amended (H) Taxation |
2023-02-27 | House | (H) Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed as Amended (H) Taxation |
2023-02-24 | House | (H) Hearing (H) Taxation |
2023-02-23 | (C) Amendments Available | |
2023-02-23 | House | (H) Fiscal Note Printed |
2023-02-23 | House | (H) Fiscal Note Unsigned |
2023-02-22 | House | (H) Fiscal Note Received |
2023-02-16 | House | (H) First Reading |
2023-02-16 | House | (H) Referred to Committee (H) Taxation |
2023-02-15 | House | (H) Fiscal Note Requested |
2023-02-15 | (C) Introduced Bill Text Available Electronically | |
2023-02-14 | House | (H) Introduced |
2023-02-14 | (C) Fiscal Note Probable | |
2023-02-13 | (C) Draft Delivered to Requester | |
2023-02-01 | (C) Executive Director Final Review | |
2023-02-01 | (C) Draft Ready for Delivery | |
2023-01-31 | (C) Draft in Assembly | |
2023-01-31 | (C) Executive Director Review | |
2023-01-30 | (C) Bill Draft Text Available Electronically | |
2023-01-30 | (C) Draft in Final Drafter Review | |
2023-01-30 | (C) Draft in Input/Proofing | |
2023-01-28 | (C) Draft to Drafter - Edit Review | |
2023-01-25 | (C) Draft in Edit | |
2023-01-24 | (C) Draft in Legal Review | |
2023-01-24 | (C) Draft to Requester for Review | |
2022-12-09 | (C) Draft Request Received |