MT HB483 | 2009 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 5 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-05-05 - Chapter Number Assigned  
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 5 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-05-05 - Chapter Number Assigned  
Summary
Revising laws governing board of environmental review related to energy projects
Title
Revising laws governing board of environmental review related to energy projects
Sponsors
Rep. Llew Jones [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-05-05 | Chapter Number Assigned   | |
2009-05-05 | (H) Signed by Governor   | |
2009-04-27 | (H) Transmitted to Governor   | |
2009-04-25 | (S) Signed by President   | |
2009-04-25 | (H) Signed by Speaker   | |
2009-04-23 | (H) Returned from Enrolling   | |
2009-04-23 | (C) Printed - New Version Available   | |
2009-04-23 | (C) Printed - New Version Available   | |
2009-04-22 | (H) Sent to Enrolling   | |
2009-04-22 | (S) Returned to House Concurred in Governor's Proposed Amendments   | |
2009-04-22 | (S) 3rd Reading Governor's Proposed Amendments Concurred   | |
2009-04-22 | (S) Scheduled for 3rd Reading   | |
2009-04-21 | (S) 2nd Reading Governor's Proposed Amendments Concurred on Voice Vote   | |
2009-04-21 | (S) Scheduled for 2nd Reading   | |
2009-04-20 | (H) Transmitted to Senate for Consideration of Governor's Proposed Amendments   | |
2009-04-20 | (H) 3rd Reading Governor's Proposed Amendments Concurred   | |
2009-04-20 | (H) Scheduled for 3rd Reading   | |
2009-04-18 | (H) 2nd Reading Governor's Proposed Amendments Concurred   | |
2009-04-18 | (H) Scheduled for 2nd Reading   | |
2009-04-16 | (H) Returned with Governor's Proposed Amendments   | |
2009-04-06 | (H) Transmitted to Governor   | |
2009-04-03 | (S) Signed by President   | |
2009-04-03 | (H) Signed by Speaker   | |
2009-04-01 | (H) Returned from Enrolling   | |
2009-03-31 | (C) Printed - New Version Available   | |
2009-03-31 | (H) Sent to Enrolling   | |
2009-03-30 | (S) Returned to House   | |
2009-03-30 | (S) 3rd Reading Concurred   | |
2009-03-30 | (S) Scheduled for 3rd Reading   | |
2009-03-28 | (S) 2nd Reading Concurred   | |
2009-03-28 | (S) Scheduled for 2nd Reading   | |
2009-03-27 | (S) Scheduled for 2nd Reading   | |
2009-03-26 | (S) Scheduled for 2nd Reading   | |
2009-03-24 | (S) Committee Report--Bill Concurred (S) Energy and Telecommunications | |
2009-03-24 | (S) Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred (S) Energy and Telecommunications | |
2009-03-19 | (S) Hearing (S) Energy and Telecommunications | |
2009-03-02 | (S) Referred to Committee (S) Energy and Telecommunications | |
2009-03-02 | (S) First Reading   | |
2009-02-25 | (H) Transmitted to Senate   | |
2009-02-25 | (H) 3rd Reading Passed   | |
2009-02-25 | (H) Scheduled for 3rd Reading   | |
2009-02-24 | (C) Printed - New Version Available   | |
2009-02-24 | (H) 2nd Reading Passed as Amended   | |
2009-02-24 | (H) 2nd Reading Motion to Amend Failed   | |
2009-02-24 | (H) 2nd Reading Motion to Amend Failed   | |
2009-02-24 | (H) 2nd Reading Motion to Amend Carried   | |
2009-02-24 | (H) Scheduled for 2nd Reading   | |
2009-02-23 | (C) Printed - New Version Available   | |
2009-02-23 | (H) Committee Report--Bill Passed as Amended (H) Federal Relations, Energy, and Telecommunications | |
2009-02-23 | (H) Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed as Amended (H) Federal Relations, Energy, and Telecommunications | |
2009-02-18 | (H) Hearing (H) Federal Relations, Energy, and Telecommunications | |
2009-02-18 | (H) Fiscal Note Printed   | |
2009-02-16 | (H) Fiscal Note Received   | |
2009-02-07 | (H) Referred to Committee (H) Federal Relations, Energy, and Telecommunications | |
2009-02-07 | (H) First Reading   | |
2009-02-07 | (H) Fiscal Note Requested   | |
2009-02-06 | (C) Introduced Bill Text Available Electronically   | |
2009-02-06 | (H) Introduced   | |
2009-02-05 | (C) Draft Delivered to Requester   | |
2009-02-03 | (C) Draft Ready for Delivery   | |
2009-02-03 | (C) Draft in Assembly/Executive Director Review   | |
2009-02-03 | (C) Draft in Final Drafter Review   | |
2009-02-02 | (C) Bill Draft Text Available Electronically   | |
2009-02-02 | (C) Draft in Input/Proofing   | |
2009-02-02 | (C) Draft to Drafter - Edit Review [SAB]   | |
2009-02-02 | (C) Draft in Edit   | |
2009-01-31 | (C) Draft in Legal Review   | |
2009-01-31 | (C) Fiscal Note Probable   | |
2009-01-31 | (C) Draft to Requester for Review   | |
2009-01-29 | (C) Draft Taken Off Hold   | |
2009-01-24 | (C) Draft On Hold   | |
2009-01-21 | (C) Draft to Requester for Review   | |
2009-01-16 | (C) Draft Taken Off Hold   | |
2008-12-30 | (C) Draft On Hold   | |
2008-11-24 | (C) Draft Request Received   |
Subjects
Montana State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://laws.leg.mt.gov/laws09/LAW0210W$BSIV.ActionQuery?P_BILL_NO1=483&P_BLTP_BILL_TYP_CD=HB&Z_ACTION=Find |