MT HB425 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 28 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-28 - (S) Died in Standing Committee (S) Judiciary
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 28 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-28 - (S) Died in Standing Committee (S) Judiciary
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Constitutional amendment to define person
Title
Constitutional amendment to define person
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-03-28 - House - (H) 3rd Reading Passed (Y: 51 N: 48 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-03-27 - House - (H) 2nd Reading Passed (Y: 54 N: 46 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-17 - House - (H) Judiciary Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed (Y: 11 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-27 - House - (H) 2nd Reading Passed (Y: 54 N: 46 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-17 - House - (H) Judiciary Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed (Y: 11 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-28 | Senate | (S) Died in Standing Committee (S) Judiciary |
2015-04-08 | Senate | (S) Committee Vote Failed; Remains in Committee (S) Judiciary |
2015-04-08 | Senate | (S) Hearing (S) Judiciary |
2015-03-31 | Senate | (S) Referred to Committee (S) Judiciary |
2015-03-31 | Senate | (S) First Reading |
2015-03-30 | House | (H) Transmitted to Senate |
2015-03-28 | House | (H) 3rd Reading Passed |
2015-03-28 | House | (H) Scheduled for 3rd Reading |
2015-03-27 | House | (H) 2nd Reading Passed |
2015-03-27 | House | (H) Scheduled for 2nd Reading |
2015-02-21 | House | (H) Committee Report--Bill Passed (H) Judiciary |
2015-02-21 | House | (H) Fiscal Note Printed |
2015-02-20 | House | (H) Fiscal Note Signed |
2015-02-20 | House | (H) Fiscal Note Received |
2015-02-17 | House | (H) Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed (H) Judiciary |
2015-02-16 | House | (H) Hearing (H) Judiciary |
2015-02-14 | House | (H) Fiscal Note Requested |
2015-02-06 | (C) Introduced Bill Text Available Electronically | |
2015-02-06 | House | (H) First Reading |
2015-02-06 | House | (H) Referred to Committee (H) Judiciary |
2015-02-06 | House | (H) Introduced |
2015-02-06 | (C) Draft Delivered to Requester | |
2015-02-06 | (C) Draft Ready for Delivery | |
2015-02-05 | (C) Draft in Assembly/Executive Director Review | |
2015-02-05 | (C) Draft in Final Drafter Review | |
2015-02-05 | (C) Bill Draft Text Available Electronically | |
2015-02-05 | (C) Draft in Input/Proofing | |
2015-02-04 | (C) Draft to Drafter - Edit Review [KWK] | |
2015-02-04 | (C) Draft in Legal Review | |
2015-01-28 | (C) Draft to Requester for Review | |
2015-01-20 | (C) Draft Request Received |