MT HB322 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 29 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-29 - (S) Died in Standing Committee (S) State Administration
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 29 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-29 - (S) Died in Standing Committee (S) State Administration
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Constitutional amendment to raise legislator residency requirement
Title
Constitutional amendment to raise legislator residency requirement
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-02-19 - House - (H) 3rd Reading Passed (Y: 77 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-18 - House - (H) 2nd Reading Passed (Y: 75 N: 25 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-12 - House - (H) Judiciary Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed (Y: 13 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-18 - House - (H) 2nd Reading Passed (Y: 75 N: 25 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-12 - House - (H) Judiciary Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed (Y: 13 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-29 | Senate | (S) Died in Standing Committee (S) State Administration |
2021-04-07 | Senate | (S) Tabled in Committee (S) State Administration |
2021-03-23 | (C) Amendments Available | |
2021-03-22 | Senate | (S) Hearing (S) State Administration |
2021-02-20 | Senate | (S) Referred to Committee (S) State Administration |
2021-02-20 | Senate | (S) First Reading |
2021-02-19 | House | (H) Transmitted to Senate |
2021-02-19 | House | (H) 3rd Reading Passed |
2021-02-19 | House | (H) Scheduled for 3rd Reading |
2021-02-18 | House | (H) 2nd Reading Passed |
2021-02-18 | House | (H) Scheduled for 2nd Reading |
2021-02-12 | House | (H) Committee Report--Bill Passed (H) Judiciary |
2021-02-12 | House | (H) Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed (H) Judiciary |
2021-02-08 | House | (H) Hearing (H) Judiciary |
2021-02-05 | House | (H) First Reading |
2021-02-05 | House | (H) Referred to Committee (H) Judiciary |
2021-02-04 | (C) Introduced Bill Text Available Electronically | |
2021-02-04 | House | (H) Introduced |
2021-02-04 | (C) Draft Delivered to Requester | |
2021-02-02 | (C) Draft Ready for Delivery | |
2021-02-02 | (C) Executive Director Final Review | |
2021-02-02 | (C) Draft Ready for Delivery | |
2021-02-02 | (C) Draft in Assembly | |
2021-02-02 | (C) Executive Director Review | |
2021-02-01 | (C) Bill Draft Text Available Electronically | |
2021-02-01 | (C) Draft in Final Drafter Review | |
2021-02-01 | (C) Draft in Input/Proofing | |
2021-01-30 | (C) Draft to Drafter - Edit Review [CMD] | |
2021-01-29 | (C) Draft in Edit | |
2021-01-28 | (C) Draft in Legal Review | |
2021-01-27 | (C) Draft to Requester for Review | |
2021-01-27 | (C) Draft Taken Off Hold | |
2021-01-16 | (C) Draft On Hold | |
2020-11-12 | (C) Draft Request Received |