MT HB32 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 31 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-01 - Chapter Number Assigned
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 31 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-01 - Chapter Number Assigned
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Repeal ending fund balance limits for school district funds
Title
Repeal ending fund balance limits for school district funds
Sponsors
Rep. Sue Vinton [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-03-16 - Senate - (S) 3rd Reading Concurred (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-15 - Senate - (S) 2nd Reading Concurred (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-03 - Senate - (S) Education and Cultural Resources Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-25 - House - (H) 3rd Reading Passed (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-01-22 - House - (H) 2nd Reading Passed (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-01-18 - House - (H) Education Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-15 - Senate - (S) 2nd Reading Concurred (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-03 - Senate - (S) Education and Cultural Resources Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-25 - House - (H) 3rd Reading Passed (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-01-22 - House - (H) 2nd Reading Passed (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-01-18 - House - (H) Education Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-01 | Chapter Number Assigned | |
2021-03-31 | House | (H) Signed by Governor |
2021-03-23 | House | (H) Transmitted to Governor |
2021-03-22 | Senate | (S) Signed by President |
2021-03-22 | House | (H) Signed by Speaker |
2021-03-18 | (C) Printed - Enrolled Version Available | |
2021-03-18 | House | (H) Returned from Enrolling |
2021-03-17 | House | (H) Sent to Enrolling |
2021-03-16 | Senate | (S) Returned to House |
2021-03-16 | Senate | (S) 3rd Reading Concurred |
2021-03-16 | Senate | (S) Scheduled for 3rd Reading |
2021-03-15 | Senate | (S) 2nd Reading Concurred |
2021-03-15 | Senate | (S) Scheduled for 2nd Reading |
2021-02-04 | Senate | (S) Committee Report--Bill Concurred (S) Education and Cultural Resources |
2021-02-03 | Senate | (S) Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred (S) Education and Cultural Resources |
2021-02-01 | Senate | (S) Hearing (S) Education and Cultural Resources |
2021-01-26 | Senate | (S) Referred to Committee (S) Education and Cultural Resources |
2021-01-26 | Senate | (S) First Reading |
2021-01-25 | House | (H) Transmitted to Senate |
2021-01-25 | House | (H) 3rd Reading Passed |
2021-01-25 | House | (H) Scheduled for 3rd Reading |
2021-01-22 | House | (H) 2nd Reading Passed |
2021-01-22 | House | (H) Scheduled for 2nd Reading |
2021-01-19 | House | (H) Committee Report--Bill Passed (H) Education |
2021-01-18 | House | (H) Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed (H) Education |
2021-01-13 | House | (H) Hearing (H) Education |
2021-01-13 | House | (H) Fiscal Note Printed |
2021-01-13 | House | (H) Fiscal Note Signed |
2021-01-12 | House | (H) Fiscal Note Received |
2021-01-04 | House | (H) First Reading (H) Education |
2020-12-24 | House | (H) Referred to Committee (H) Education |
2020-12-23 | House | (H) Fiscal Note Requested |
2020-12-13 | House | (H) Introduced |
2020-12-13 | (C) Introduced Bill Text Available Electronically | |
2020-11-27 | (C) Draft in Assembly | |
2020-11-25 | (C) Executive Director Final Review | |
2020-11-25 | (C) Draft Ready for Delivery | |
2020-11-25 | (C) Draft in Assembly | |
2020-11-25 | (C) Executive Director Review | |
2020-11-24 | (C) Bill Draft Text Available Electronically | |
2020-11-24 | (C) Draft in Final Drafter Review | |
2020-11-10 | (C) Draft in Input/Proofing | |
2020-11-09 | (C) Draft to Drafter - Edit Review [CMD] | |
2020-10-26 | (C) Draft in Edit | |
2020-09-30 | (C) Draft in Legal Review | |
2020-08-13 | (C) Draft Request Received |