MT HB318 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 25 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-26 - Chapter Number Assigned
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 25 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-26 - Chapter Number Assigned
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Generally revise laws related to central committees
Title
Generally revise laws related to central committees
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-01 - Senate - (S) 3rd Reading Concurred (Y: 28 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-29 - Senate - (S) 2nd Reading Concurred (Y: 26 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-19 - House - (H) 3rd Reading Passed (Y: 61 N: 38 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-18 - House - (H) 2nd Reading Passed (Y: 61 N: 38 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-14 - House - (H) State Administration Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed as Amended (Y: 17 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-29 - Senate - (S) 2nd Reading Concurred (Y: 26 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-19 - House - (H) 3rd Reading Passed (Y: 61 N: 38 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-18 - House - (H) 2nd Reading Passed (Y: 61 N: 38 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-14 - House - (H) State Administration Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed as Amended (Y: 17 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-26 | Chapter Number Assigned | |
2019-04-25 | House | (H) Signed by Governor |
2019-04-18 | House | (H) Transmitted to Governor |
2019-04-18 | Senate | (S) Signed by President |
2019-04-18 | House | (H) Signed by Speaker |
2019-04-03 | (C) Printed - Enrolled Version Available | |
2019-04-03 | House | (H) Returned from Enrolling |
2019-04-01 | House | (H) Sent to Enrolling |
2019-04-01 | Senate | (S) Returned to House |
2019-04-01 | Senate | (S) 3rd Reading Concurred |
2019-04-01 | Senate | (S) Scheduled for 3rd Reading |
2019-03-29 | Senate | (S) 2nd Reading Concurred |
2019-03-29 | Senate | (S) Motion Failed |
2019-03-29 | Senate | (S) Motion Carried |
2019-03-29 | Senate | (S) Scheduled for 2nd Reading |
2019-03-28 | Senate | (S) Scheduled for 2nd Reading |
2019-03-27 | Senate | (S) Taken from Committee; Placed on 2nd Reading (S) State Administration |
2019-03-25 | Senate | (S) Hearing (S) State Administration |
2019-03-09 | Senate | (S) Referred to Committee (S) State Administration |
2019-02-20 | Senate | (S) First Reading |
2019-02-19 | House | (H) Transmitted to Senate |
2019-02-19 | House | (H) 3rd Reading Passed |
2019-02-19 | House | (H) Scheduled for 3rd Reading |
2019-02-18 | House | (H) 2nd Reading Passed |
2019-02-18 | House | (H) Scheduled for 2nd Reading |
2019-02-14 | (C) Printed - New Version Available | |
2019-02-14 | House | (H) Committee Report--Bill Passed as Amended (H) State Administration |
2019-02-14 | House | (H) Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed as Amended (H) State Administration |
2019-02-06 | House | (H) Hearing (H) State Administration |
2019-01-28 | (C) Introduced Bill Text Available Electronically | |
2019-01-28 | House | (H) First Reading (H) State Administration |
2019-01-28 | House | (H) Referred to Committee (H) State Administration |
2019-01-28 | House | (H) Introduced |
2019-01-24 | (C) Draft Delivered to Requester | |
2019-01-15 | (C) Executive Director Final Review | |
2019-01-14 | (C) Bill Draft Text Available Electronically | |
2019-01-14 | (C) Draft in Final Drafter Review | |
2019-01-11 | (C) Draft in Legal Review | |
2019-01-10 | (C) Draft to Requester for Review | |
2019-01-09 | (C) Draft Back for Redo | |
2019-01-07 | (C) Draft Ready for Delivery | |
2019-01-07 | (C) Executive Director Final Review | |
2019-01-07 | (C) Draft in Assembly | |
2019-01-07 | (C) Executive Director Review | |
2019-01-04 | (C) Bill Draft Text Available Electronically | |
2019-01-04 | (C) Draft in Final Drafter Review | |
2019-01-03 | (C) Draft in Input/Proofing | |
2019-01-03 | (C) Draft to Drafter - Edit Review [CMD] | |
2019-01-03 | (C) Draft in Edit | |
2019-01-03 | (C) Draft in Legal Review | |
2018-12-24 | (C) Draft to Requester for Review | |
2018-12-18 | (C) Draft to Requester for Review | |
2018-10-15 | (C) Draft Taken Off Hold | |
2018-08-29 | (C) Draft On Hold | |
2018-08-07 | (C) Draft Request Received |