MT HB28 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 18 2021 - 50% progression
Action: 2021-01-29 - (S) Committee Report--Bill Concurred (S) Judiciary
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

Revise Board of Crime Control laws to remove duty to hear POST Council appeals

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Revise Board of Crime Control laws to remove duty to hear POST Council appeals

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-01-29 - Senate - (S) Judiciary Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-18 - House - (H) 3rd Reading Passed (Y: 83 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-01-14 - House - (H) 2nd Reading Passed as Amended (Y: 82 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-11 - House - (H) Judiciary Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-01-29Senate(S) Committee Report--Bill Concurred (S) Judiciary
2021-01-29Senate(S) Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred (S) Judiciary
2021-01-27Senate(S) Hearing (S) Judiciary
2021-01-19Senate(S) Referred to Committee (S) Judiciary
2021-01-19Senate(S) First Reading
2021-01-18House(H) Transmitted to Senate
2021-01-18House(H) 3rd Reading Passed
2021-01-18House(H) Scheduled for 3rd Reading
2021-01-14House(H) 2nd Reading Passed as Amended
2021-01-14House(H) 2nd Reading Motion to Amend Carried
2021-01-14House(H) Scheduled for 2nd Reading
2021-01-14 (C) Amendments Available
2021-01-12House(H) Committee Report--Bill Passed (H) Judiciary
2021-01-11House(H) Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed (H) Judiciary
2021-01-06House(H) Hearing (H) Judiciary
2021-01-04House(H) First Reading (H) Judiciary
2020-12-24House(H) Referred to Committee (H) Judiciary
2020-12-13House(H) Introduced
2020-12-13 (C) Introduced Bill Text Available Electronically
2020-11-30 (C) Draft in Assembly
2020-11-30 (C) Executive Director Review
2020-11-27 (C) Bill Draft Text Available Electronically
2020-11-27 (C) Draft in Final Drafter Review
2020-11-24 (C) Draft in Input/Proofing
2020-11-24 (C) Draft to Drafter - Edit Review [CMD]
2020-11-08 (C) Draft in Edit
2020-11-04 (C) Draft in Legal Review
2020-09-16 (C) Draft Request Received

Subjects


Montana State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback