MT HB241 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 8 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-08 - Chapter Number Assigned
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 8 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-08 - Chapter Number Assigned
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Clarify definition of commercial motor vehicle for emergency vehicles
Title
Clarify definition of commercial motor vehicle for emergency vehicles
Sponsors
Rep. Tom Berry [R] |
Roll Calls
2015-03-25 - House - (H) 3rd Reading Passed as Amended by Senate (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-03-24 - House - (H) 2nd Reading Senate Amendments Concurred (Y: 99 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-12 - Senate - (S) 3rd Reading Concurred (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-03-11 - Senate - (S) 2nd Reading Concurred (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-02-17 - Senate - (S) Highways and Transportation Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred as Amended (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-02 - House - (H) 3rd Reading Passed (Y: 98 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-01-31 - House - (H) 2nd Reading Passed (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-28 - House - (H) Transportation Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-24 - House - (H) 2nd Reading Senate Amendments Concurred (Y: 99 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-12 - Senate - (S) 3rd Reading Concurred (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-03-11 - Senate - (S) 2nd Reading Concurred (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-02-17 - Senate - (S) Highways and Transportation Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred as Amended (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-02 - House - (H) 3rd Reading Passed (Y: 98 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-01-31 - House - (H) 2nd Reading Passed (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-28 - House - (H) Transportation Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-08 | Chapter Number Assigned | |
2015-04-08 | House | (H) Signed by Governor |
2015-03-30 | House | (H) Transmitted to Governor |
2015-03-28 | Senate | (S) Signed by President |
2015-03-27 | House | (H) Signed by Speaker |
2015-03-26 | House | (H) Returned from Enrolling |
2015-03-26 | (C) Printed - Enrolled Version Available | |
2015-03-25 | House | (H) Sent to Enrolling |
2015-03-25 | House | (H) 3rd Reading Passed as Amended by Senate |
2015-03-25 | House | (H) Scheduled for 3rd Reading |
2015-03-24 | House | (H) 2nd Reading Senate Amendments Concurred |
2015-03-24 | House | (H) Scheduled for 2nd Reading |
2015-03-12 | Senate | (S) Returned to House with Amendments |
2015-03-12 | Senate | (S) 3rd Reading Concurred |
2015-03-12 | Senate | (S) Scheduled for 3rd Reading |
2015-03-11 | Senate | (S) 2nd Reading Concurred |
2015-03-11 | Senate | (S) Scheduled for 2nd Reading |
2015-02-18 | Senate | (S) Committee Report--Bill Concurred as Amended (S) Highways and Transportation |
2015-02-18 | (C) Printed - New Version Available | |
2015-02-17 | Senate | (S) Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred as Amended (S) Highways and Transportation |
2015-02-10 | Senate | (S) Hearing (S) Highways and Transportation |
2015-02-04 | Senate | (S) Referred to Committee (S) Highways and Transportation |
2015-02-04 | Senate | (S) First Reading |
2015-02-03 | House | (H) Transmitted to Senate |
2015-02-02 | House | (H) 3rd Reading Passed |
2015-02-02 | House | (H) Scheduled for 3rd Reading |
2015-01-31 | House | (H) 2nd Reading Passed |
2015-01-31 | House | (H) Scheduled for 2nd Reading |
2015-01-29 | House | (H) Committee Report--Bill Passed (H) Transportation |
2015-01-28 | House | (H) Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed (H) Transportation |
2015-01-26 | House | (H) Hearing (H) Transportation |
2015-01-19 | (C) Introduced Bill Text Available Electronically | |
2015-01-19 | House | (H) First Reading |
2015-01-19 | House | (H) Referred to Committee (H) Transportation |
2015-01-19 | House | (H) Introduced |
2015-01-16 | (C) Draft Delivered to Requester | |
2015-01-15 | (C) Draft Ready for Delivery | |
2015-01-15 | (C) Draft in Assembly/Executive Director Review | |
2015-01-15 | (C) Draft in Final Drafter Review | |
2015-01-15 | (C) Bill Draft Text Available Electronically | |
2015-01-15 | (C) Draft in Input/Proofing | |
2015-01-14 | (C) Draft to Drafter - Edit Review [CMD] | |
2015-01-13 | (C) Draft in Legal Review | |
2015-01-12 | (C) Draft to Requester for Review | |
2014-12-05 | (C) Draft On Hold | |
2014-11-13 | (C) Draft Request Received |