MT HB235 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 24 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-24 - (H) Died in Standing Committee (H) Judiciary
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 24 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-24 - (H) Died in Standing Committee (H) Judiciary
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Revise trespass laws
Title
Revise trespass laws
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-04-24 | House | (H) Died in Standing Committee (H) Judiciary |
2013-02-28 | House | (H) Missed Deadline for General Bill Transmittal |
2013-02-18 | House | (H) Motion Failed |
2013-01-30 | House | (H) Tabled in Committee (H) Judiciary |
2013-01-22 | (C) Legal Review Note | |
2013-01-21 | House | (H) Hearing (H) Judiciary |
2013-01-17 | House | (H) First Reading |
2013-01-17 | House | (H) Referred to Committee (H) Judiciary |
2013-01-17 | (C) Introduced Bill Text Available Electronically | |
2013-01-16 | House | (H) Introduced |
2013-01-15 | (C) Draft Delivered to Requester | |
2013-01-10 | (C) Draft Ready for Delivery | |
2013-01-09 | (C) Draft in Assembly/Executive Director Review | |
2013-01-09 | (C) Draft in Final Drafter Review | |
2013-01-09 | (C) Bill Draft Text Available Electronically | |
2013-01-09 | (C) Draft in Input/Proofing | |
2013-01-08 | (C) Draft to Drafter - Edit Review [CMD] | |
2012-12-27 | (C) Draft in Legal Review | |
2012-12-11 | (C) Draft to Requester for Review | |
2012-11-29 | (C) Draft Request Received |
Subjects
Montana State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://laws.leg.mt.gov/legprd/LAW0210W$BSIV.ActionQuery?P_BILL_NO1=235&P_BLTP_BILL_TYP_CD=HB&Z_ACTION=Find&P_SESS=20131 |
Text | https://leg.mt.gov/bills/2013/hb0299/HB0235_1.pdf |