MT HB231 | 2009 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 28 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-04-28 - (S) Died in Standing Committee  

Summary

Revise laws on incorporation of cities and towns

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Revise laws on incorporation of cities and towns

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2009-04-28 (S) Died in Standing Committee  
2009-04-07 (S) Tabled in Committee (S) Local Government
2009-03-04 (S) Hearing (S) Local Government
2009-02-23 (S) Referred to Committee (S) Local Government
2009-02-23 (S) First Reading  
2009-01-27 (H) Transmitted to Senate  
2009-01-26 (H) 3rd Reading Passed  
2009-01-26 (H) Scheduled for 3rd Reading  
2009-01-24 (H) 2nd Reading Passed  
2009-01-24 (H) Scheduled for 2nd Reading  
2009-01-23 (H) Committee Report--Bill Passed (H) Local Government
2009-01-23 (H) Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed (H) Local Government
2009-01-22 (H) Hearing (H) Local Government
2009-01-12 (C) Introduced Bill Text Available Electronically  
2009-01-12 (H) First Reading  
2009-01-12 (H) Referred to Committee (H) Local Government
2009-01-12 (H) Introduced  
2009-01-08 (C) Draft Delivered to Requester  
2009-01-07 (C) Draft Ready for Delivery  
2009-01-05 (C) Draft in Assembly/Executive Director Review  
2009-01-05 (C) Draft in Final Drafter Review  
2009-01-05 (C) Bill Draft Text Available Electronically  
2009-01-05 (C) Draft in Input/Proofing  
2009-01-05 (C) Draft to Drafter - Edit Review [CMD]  
2009-01-05 (C) Draft in Edit  
2009-01-05 (C) Draft in Legal Review  
2009-01-05 (C) Draft to Requester for Review  
2009-01-02 (H) Hearing (H) Local Government
2008-12-19 (C) Draft On Hold  
2008-11-24 (C) Draft Request Received  

Subjects


Montana State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback