MT HB209 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 6 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-03-10 - (H) Missed Deadline for General Bill Transmittal
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 6 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-03-10 - (H) Missed Deadline for General Bill Transmittal
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Revise live poker prize limit
Title
Revise live poker prize limit
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-01-25 - House - (H) 3rd Reading Failed (Y: 48 N: 52 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2023-01-24 - House - (H) 2nd Reading Passed (Y: 51 N: 48 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-24 - House - (H) 2nd Reading Motion to Amend Failed (Y: 14 N: 85 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2023-01-23 - House - (H) Reconsidered Previous Action; Placed on 2nd Reading (Y: 54 N: 45 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-20 - House - (H) 2nd Reading Not Passed (Y: 42 N: 57 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2023-01-17 - House - (H) Business and Labor Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed (Y: 11 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-24 - House - (H) 2nd Reading Passed (Y: 51 N: 48 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-24 - House - (H) 2nd Reading Motion to Amend Failed (Y: 14 N: 85 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2023-01-23 - House - (H) Reconsidered Previous Action; Placed on 2nd Reading (Y: 54 N: 45 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-20 - House - (H) 2nd Reading Not Passed (Y: 42 N: 57 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2023-01-17 - House - (H) Business and Labor Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed (Y: 11 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-10 | House | (H) Missed Deadline for General Bill Transmittal |
2023-01-25 | House | (H) 3rd Reading Failed |
2023-01-25 | House | (H) Scheduled for 3rd Reading |
2023-01-24 | House | (H) 2nd Reading Passed |
2023-01-24 | House | (H) 2nd Reading Motion to Amend Failed |
2023-01-24 | House | (H) Scheduled for 2nd Reading |
2023-01-24 | (C) Amendments Available | |
2023-01-23 | House | (H) Reconsidered Previous Action; Placed on 2nd Reading |
2023-01-20 | House | (H) 2nd Reading Not Passed |
2023-01-18 | House | (H) Committee Report--Bill Passed (H) Business and Labor |
2023-01-17 | House | (H) Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed (H) Business and Labor |
2023-01-16 | House | (H) Fiscal Note Printed |
2023-01-13 | House | (H) Fiscal Note Signed |
2023-01-12 | House | (H) Fiscal Note Received |
2023-01-12 | House | (H) Hearing (H) Business and Labor |
2023-01-09 | House | (H) First Reading |
2023-01-09 | House | (H) Referred to Committee (H) Business and Labor |
2023-01-06 | House | (H) Fiscal Note Requested |
2023-01-06 | (C) Introduced Bill Text Available Electronically | |
2023-01-06 | House | (H) Introduced |
2023-01-06 | (C) Fiscal Note Probable | |
2023-01-05 | (C) Draft Delivered to Requester | |
2022-12-28 | (C) Draft Ready for Delivery | |
2022-12-27 | (C) Executive Director Final Review | |
2022-12-27 | (C) Draft Ready for Delivery | |
2022-12-26 | (C) Draft in Assembly | |
2022-12-23 | (C) Executive Director Review | |
2022-12-15 | (C) Bill Draft Text Available Electronically | |
2022-12-15 | (C) Draft in Final Drafter Review | |
2022-12-15 | (C) Draft in Input/Proofing | |
2022-12-14 | (C) Draft to Drafter - Edit Review | |
2022-11-29 | (C) Draft in Edit | |
2022-11-28 | (C) Draft in Legal Review | |
2022-11-11 | (C) Draft Request Received |