MT HB202 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on March 2 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-02 - (H) Vetoed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Vetoed on March 2 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-02 - (H) Vetoed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Generally revise laws related to government employees and officers
Title
Generally revise laws related to government employees and officers
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-02-15 - Senate - (S) 3rd Reading Concurred (Y: 32 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-02-14 - Senate - (S) 2nd Reading Concurred (Y: 32 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-02-09 - Senate - (S) Judiciary Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-30 - House - (H) 3rd Reading Passed (Y: 66 N: 32 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-01-27 - House - (H) 2nd Reading Passed (Y: 63 N: 37 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-25 - House - (H) Judiciary Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed as Amended (Y: 12 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-14 - Senate - (S) 2nd Reading Concurred (Y: 32 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-02-09 - Senate - (S) Judiciary Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-30 - House - (H) 3rd Reading Passed (Y: 66 N: 32 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-01-27 - House - (H) 2nd Reading Passed (Y: 63 N: 37 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-25 - House - (H) Judiciary Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed as Amended (Y: 12 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-02 | House | (H) Vetoed by Governor |
2017-02-22 | House | (H) Transmitted to Governor |
2017-02-21 | Senate | (S) Signed by President |
2017-02-21 | House | (H) Signed by Speaker |
2017-02-21 | (C) Printed - Enrolled Version Available | |
2017-02-20 | House | (H) Returned from Enrolling |
2017-02-16 | House | (H) Sent to Enrolling |
2017-02-15 | Senate | (S) Returned to House |
2017-02-15 | Senate | (S) 3rd Reading Concurred |
2017-02-15 | Senate | (S) Scheduled for 3rd Reading |
2017-02-14 | Senate | (S) 2nd Reading Concurred |
2017-02-14 | Senate | (S) Scheduled for 2nd Reading |
2017-02-09 | Senate | (S) Committee Report--Bill Concurred (S) Judiciary |
2017-02-09 | Senate | (S) Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred (S) Judiciary |
2017-02-07 | Senate | (S) Hearing (S) Judiciary |
2017-01-31 | Senate | (S) Referred to Committee (S) Judiciary |
2017-01-31 | Senate | (S) First Reading |
2017-01-30 | House | (H) Transmitted to Senate |
2017-01-30 | House | (H) 3rd Reading Passed |
2017-01-30 | House | (H) Scheduled for 3rd Reading |
2017-01-27 | House | (H) 2nd Reading Passed |
2017-01-27 | House | (H) Scheduled for 2nd Reading |
2017-01-25 | (C) Printed - New Version Available | |
2017-01-25 | House | (H) Committee Report--Bill Passed as Amended (H) Judiciary |
2017-01-25 | House | (H) Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed as Amended (H) Judiciary |
2017-01-16 | House | (H) Fiscal Note Printed |
2017-01-13 | House | (H) Fiscal Note Signed |
2017-01-13 | House | (H) Fiscal Note Received |
2017-01-12 | House | (H) Hearing (H) Judiciary |
2017-01-09 | (C) Introduced Bill Text Available Electronically | |
2017-01-09 | House | (H) First Reading (H) Judiciary |
2017-01-09 | House | (H) Referred to Committee (H) Judiciary |
2017-01-09 | House | (H) Fiscal Note Requested |
2017-01-09 | House | (H) Introduced |
2017-01-09 | (C) Draft Delivered to Requester | |
2017-01-06 | (C) Draft Ready for Delivery | |
2017-01-06 | (C) Executive Director Final Review | |
2017-01-06 | (C) Draft in Assembly | |
2017-01-06 | (C) Executive Director Review | |
2017-01-06 | (C) Bill Draft Text Available Electronically | |
2017-01-06 | (C) Draft in Final Drafter Review | |
2017-01-05 | (C) Draft in Input/Proofing | |
2017-01-05 | (C) Draft to Drafter - Edit Review [KWK] | |
2017-01-05 | (C) Draft in Edit | |
2017-01-05 | (C) Draft in Legal Review | |
2017-01-04 | (C) Draft to Requester for Review | |
2016-12-19 | (C) Draft to Requester for Review | |
2016-12-19 | (C) Fiscal Note Probable | |
2016-11-22 | (C) Draft Request Received |