MT HB191 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 28 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-28 - (S) Died in Standing Committee (S) Conference
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 28 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-28 - (S) Died in Standing Committee (S) Conference
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Revise laws governing investigations of abuse at Montana state hospital
Title
Revise laws governing investigations of abuse at Montana state hospital
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-04-21 - House - (H) Rules Suspended to Accept Late Return of Amended Bill (Y: 87 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-20 - Senate - (S) 3rd Reading Concurred (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-18 - Senate - (S) 2nd Reading Concurred (Y: 46 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-04-17 - Senate - (S) Finance and Claims Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred as Amended (Y: 17 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-23 - House - (H) 3rd Reading Passed (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-02-21 - House - (H) 2nd Reading Passed (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-18 - House - (H) Appropriations Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed as Amended (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-06 - House - (H) 2nd Reading Passed (Y: 94 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-02-04 - House - (H) Human Services Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-20 - Senate - (S) 3rd Reading Concurred (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-18 - Senate - (S) 2nd Reading Concurred (Y: 46 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-04-17 - Senate - (S) Finance and Claims Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred as Amended (Y: 17 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-23 - House - (H) 3rd Reading Passed (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-02-21 - House - (H) 2nd Reading Passed (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-18 - House - (H) Appropriations Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed as Amended (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-06 - House - (H) 2nd Reading Passed (Y: 94 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-02-04 - House - (H) Human Services Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-28 | Senate | (S) Died in Standing Committee (S) Conference |
2015-04-23 | Senate | (S) Hearing (S) Conference |
2015-04-22 | House | (H) Conference Committee Appointed |
2015-04-22 | Senate | (S) Conference Committee Appointed (S) Conference |
2015-04-22 | House | (H) 2nd Reading Senate Amendments Not Concurred |
2015-04-22 | House | (H) Scheduled for 2nd Reading |
2015-04-22 | House | (H) Revised Fiscal Note Printed |
2015-04-21 | House | (H) Rules Suspended to Accept Late Return of Amended Bill |
2015-04-21 | House | (H) Revised Fiscal Note Received |
2015-04-20 | Senate | (S) Returned to House with Amendments |
2015-04-20 | Senate | (S) 3rd Reading Concurred |
2015-04-20 | Senate | (S) Scheduled for 3rd Reading |
2015-04-18 | Senate | (S) 2nd Reading Concurred |
2015-04-18 | House | (H) Revised Fiscal Note Requested |
2015-04-18 | Senate | (S) Scheduled for 2nd Reading |
2015-04-17 | (C) Printed - New Version Available | |
2015-04-17 | Senate | (S) Committee Report--Bill Concurred as Amended (S) Finance and Claims |
2015-04-17 | Senate | (S) Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred as Amended (S) Finance and Claims |
2015-04-17 | Senate | (S) Taken from Table in Committee (S) Finance and Claims |
2015-04-07 | Senate | (S) Tabled in Committee (S) Finance and Claims |
2015-03-11 | Senate | (S) Hearing (S) Finance and Claims |
2015-03-05 | Senate | (S) Referred to Committee (S) Finance and Claims |
2015-03-05 | Senate | (S) First Reading |
2015-02-24 | House | (H) Transmitted to Senate |
2015-02-23 | House | (H) 3rd Reading Passed |
2015-02-23 | House | (H) Scheduled for 3rd Reading |
2015-02-21 | House | (H) 2nd Reading Passed |
2015-02-21 | House | (H) Scheduled for 2nd Reading |
2015-02-21 | House | (H) Revised Fiscal Note Requested |
2015-02-19 | (C) Printed - New Version Available | |
2015-02-19 | House | (H) Committee Report--Bill Passed as Amended (H) Appropriations |
2015-02-18 | House | (H) Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed as Amended (H) Appropriations |
2015-02-13 | House | (H) Hearing (H) Appropriations |
2015-02-06 | House | (H) Rereferred to Committee (H) Appropriations |
2015-02-06 | House | (H) 2nd Reading Passed |
2015-02-06 | House | (H) Scheduled for 2nd Reading |
2015-02-05 | (C) Printed - New Version Available | |
2015-02-05 | (C) Sponsors Engrossed | |
2015-02-05 | House | (H) Committee Report--Bill Passed (H) Human Services |
2015-02-04 | House | (H) Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed (H) Human Services |
2015-01-26 | House | (H) Sponsor Rebuttal to Fiscal Note Printed |
2015-01-24 | House | (H) Sponsor Rebuttal to Fiscal Note Signed (H) Human Services |
2015-01-24 | House | (H) Sponsor Rebuttal to Fiscal Note Received |
2015-01-21 | House | (H) Fiscal Note Printed (H) Human Services |
2015-01-20 | House | (H) Sponsor Rebuttal to Fiscal Note Requested (H) Human Services |
2015-01-19 | House | (H) Fiscal Note Received (H) Human Services |
2015-01-14 | House | (H) Hearing (H) Human Services |
2015-01-09 | (C) Introduced Bill Text Available Electronically | |
2015-01-09 | House | (H) First Reading |
2015-01-09 | House | (H) Referred to Committee (H) Human Services |
2015-01-09 | House | (H) Introduced |
2015-01-09 | House | (H) Fiscal Note Requested |
2015-01-07 | (C) Draft Delivered to Requester | |
2014-12-22 | (C) Draft Ready for Delivery | |
2014-12-18 | (C) Draft in Assembly/Executive Director Review | |
2014-12-18 | (C) Draft in Final Drafter Review | |
2014-12-17 | (C) Bill Draft Text Available Electronically | |
2014-12-17 | (C) Draft in Input/Proofing | |
2014-12-17 | (C) Draft to Drafter - Edit Review [SMH] | |
2014-12-15 | (C) Draft in Legal Review | |
2014-12-15 | (C) Fiscal Note Probable | |
2014-12-08 | (C) Draft to Requester for Review | |
2014-12-01 | (C) Draft to Requester for Review | |
2014-11-26 | (C) Draft Request Received |