MT HB189 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 28 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-28 - (H) Died in Process
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 28 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-28 - (H) Died in Process
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Professional retirement option and funding changes for TRS
Title
Professional retirement option and funding changes for TRS
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-03-16 - House - (H) 2nd Reading Not Passed as Amended (Y: 32 N: 67 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2011-03-04 - House - (H) Reconsidered Previous Action; Placed on 2nd Reading (Y: 59 N: 40 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-03-03 - House - (H) 2nd Reading Not Passed as Amended (Y: 47 N: 51 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2011-03-04 - House - (H) Reconsidered Previous Action; Placed on 2nd Reading (Y: 59 N: 40 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-03-03 - House - (H) 2nd Reading Not Passed as Amended (Y: 47 N: 51 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-04-28 | (H) Died in Process | |
2011-03-25 | (H) Missed Deadline for Appropriation Bill Transmittal | |
2011-03-16 | (H) 2nd Reading Not Passed as Amended | |
2011-03-16 | (H) 2nd Reading Motion to Amend Failed | |
2011-03-16 | (H) 2nd Reading Motion to Amend Carried | |
2011-03-16 | (H) 2nd Reading Motion to Amend Carried | |
2011-03-16 | (H) Scheduled for 2nd Reading | |
2011-03-10 | (H) 2nd Reading Pass Consideration | |
2011-03-10 | (H) Scheduled for 2nd Reading | |
2011-03-04 | (H) Reconsidered Previous Action; Placed on 2nd Reading | |
2011-03-03 | (H) 2nd Reading Not Passed as Amended | |
2011-03-03 | (H) 2nd Reading Motion to Amend Carried | |
2011-03-03 | (H) Scheduled for 2nd Reading | |
2011-03-02 | (H) 2nd Reading Pass Consideration | |
2011-03-02 | (H) Scheduled for 2nd Reading | |
2011-02-23 | (H) Revised Fiscal Note Printed | |
2011-02-22 | (H) Revised Fiscal Note Signed | |
2011-02-22 | (H) Revised Fiscal Note Received | |
2011-02-18 | (C) Printed - New Version Available | |
2011-02-18 | (H) Committee Report--Bill Passed as Amended (H) State Administration | |
2011-02-18 | (H) Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed as Amended (H) State Administration | |
2011-02-18 | (H) Taken from Table in Committee (H) State Administration | |
2011-02-15 | (H) Tabled in Committee (H) State Administration | |
2011-01-27 | (H) Hearing (H) State Administration | |
2011-01-19 | (H) Fiscal Note Printed | |
2011-01-18 | (H) Fiscal Note Signed | |
2011-01-17 | (H) Fiscal Note Received | |
2011-01-07 | (H) Referred to Committee (H) State Administration | |
2011-01-06 | (C) Introduced Bill Text Available Electronically | |
2011-01-06 | (H) Fiscal Note Requested | |
2011-01-06 | (H) Introduced | |
2011-01-05 | (C) Draft Delivered to Requester | |
2011-01-03 | (C) Draft Ready for Delivery | |
2010-12-20 | (C) Pre-Introduction Letter Sent | |
2010-12-17 | (C) Draft in Assembly/Executive Director Review | |
2010-12-16 | (C) Draft in Assembly/Executive Director Review | |
2010-12-16 | (C) Draft in Final Drafter Review | |
2010-12-16 | (C) Bill Draft Text Available Electronically | |
2010-12-16 | (C) Draft in Input/Proofing | |
2010-12-16 | (C) Draft to Drafter - Edit Review [SAB] | |
2010-12-09 | (C) Draft in Legal Review | |
2010-12-08 | (C) Draft to Requester for Review | |
2010-12-07 | (C) Draft to Requester for Review | |
2010-12-07 | (C) Fiscal Note Probable | |
2010-11-24 | (C) Draft Request Received |