MT HB185 | 2011 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 8 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-08 - Chapter Number Assigned
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Ban synthetic marijuana

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Ban synthetic marijuana

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2011-03-28 - Senate - (S) 3rd Reading Concurred (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-26 - Senate - (S) 2nd Reading Concurred (Y: 47 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2011-02-05 - House - (H) 3rd Reading Passed (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2011-02-04 - House - (H) 2nd Reading Passed (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2011-04-08 Chapter Number Assigned
2011-04-08 (H) Signed by Governor
2011-03-31 (H) Transmitted to Governor
2011-03-30 (S) Signed by President
2011-03-30 (H) Signed by Speaker
2011-03-29 (C) Printed - Enrolled Version Available
2011-03-29 (H) Returned from Enrolling
2011-03-28 (H) Sent to Enrolling
2011-03-28 (S) Returned to House
2011-03-28 (S) 3rd Reading Concurred
2011-03-28 (S) Scheduled for 3rd Reading
2011-03-26 (S) 2nd Reading Concurred
2011-03-26 (S) Scheduled for 2nd Reading
2011-03-24 (S) Committee Report--Bill Concurred (S) Judiciary
2011-03-24 (S) Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred (S) Judiciary
2011-03-18 (S) Hearing (S) Judiciary
2011-02-10 (S) Referred to Committee (S) Judiciary
2011-02-10 (S) First Reading
2011-02-05 (H) Transmitted to Senate
2011-02-05 (H) 3rd Reading Passed
2011-02-05 (H) Scheduled for 3rd Reading
2011-02-04 (H) 2nd Reading Passed
2011-02-04 (H) Scheduled for 2nd Reading
2011-02-02 (C) Printed - New Version Available
2011-02-02 (H) Committee Report--Bill Passed as Amended (H) Human Services
2011-01-31 (H) Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed as Amended (H) Human Services
2011-01-19 (H) Hearing (H) Human Services
2011-01-17 (H) Fiscal Note Printed
2011-01-14 (H) Fiscal Note Signed
2011-01-14 (H) Fiscal Note Received
2011-01-07 (H) Referred to Committee (H) Human Services
2011-01-06 (C) Introduced Bill Text Available Electronically
2011-01-06 (H) Fiscal Note Requested
2011-01-06 (H) Introduced
2011-01-06 (C) Draft Delivered to Requester
2011-01-05 (C) Draft Ready for Delivery
2011-01-04 (C) Fiscal Note Probable
2011-01-04 (C) Draft in Assembly/Executive Director Review
2011-01-03 (C) Draft in Final Drafter Review
2011-01-03 (C) Bill Draft Text Available Electronically
2011-01-03 (C) Draft in Input/Proofing
2011-01-03 (C) Draft to Drafter - Edit Review [JLN]
2010-12-27 (C) Draft in Legal Review
2010-12-10 (C) Draft On Hold
2010-11-11 (C) Draft to Requester for Review
2010-10-13 (C) Draft Request Received

Subjects


Montana State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback