MT HB18 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 24 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-24 - (H) Died in Process
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 24 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-24 - (H) Died in Process
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Clarify general fund transfers to the research and commercialization account
Title
Clarify general fund transfers to the research and commercialization account
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-02-19 - Senate - (S) 3rd Reading Concurred (Y: 39 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2013-02-18 - Senate - (S) 2nd Reading Concurred (Y: 43 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2013-01-30 - House - (H) 3rd Reading Passed (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2013-01-29 - House - (H) 2nd Reading Passed (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-18 - Senate - (S) 2nd Reading Concurred (Y: 43 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2013-01-30 - House - (H) 3rd Reading Passed (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2013-01-29 - House - (H) 2nd Reading Passed (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-04-24 | House | (H) Died in Process |
2013-03-05 | House | (H) Vetoed by Governor |
2013-02-23 | House | (H) Transmitted to Governor |
2013-02-22 | Senate | (S) Signed by President |
2013-02-22 | House | (H) Signed by Speaker |
2013-02-21 | House | (H) Returned from Enrolling |
2013-02-21 | (C) Printed - Enrolled Version Available | |
2013-02-20 | House | (H) Sent to Enrolling |
2013-02-20 | Senate | (S) Returned to House |
2013-02-19 | Senate | (S) 3rd Reading Concurred |
2013-02-19 | Senate | (S) Scheduled for 3rd Reading |
2013-02-18 | Senate | (S) 2nd Reading Concurred |
2013-02-18 | Senate | (S) Scheduled for 2nd Reading |
2013-02-15 | Senate | (S) Committee Report--Bill Concurred (S) Finance and Claims |
2013-02-14 | Senate | (S) Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred (S) Finance and Claims |
2013-02-12 | Senate | (S) Hearing (S) Finance and Claims |
2013-02-07 | Senate | (S) Referred to Committee (S) Finance and Claims |
2013-02-07 | Senate | (S) First Reading |
2013-01-31 | House | (H) Transmitted to Senate |
2013-01-30 | House | (H) 3rd Reading Passed |
2013-01-30 | House | (H) Scheduled for 3rd Reading |
2013-01-29 | House | (H) 2nd Reading Passed |
2013-01-29 | House | (H) Scheduled for 2nd Reading |
2013-01-25 | House | (H) Committee Report--Bill Passed (H) Appropriations |
2013-01-24 | House | (H) Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed (H) Appropriations |
2013-01-15 | House | (H) Hearing (H) Appropriations |
2013-01-10 | House | (H) Fiscal Note Printed |
2013-01-08 | House | (H) Fiscal Note Signed |
2013-01-07 | House | (H) First Reading |
2013-01-07 | House | (H) Fiscal Note Received |
2012-12-05 | House | (H) Referred to Committee (H) Appropriations |
2012-12-05 | House | (H) Fiscal Note Requested |
2012-11-15 | (C) Introduced Bill Text Available Electronically | |
2012-11-15 | House | (H) Introduced |
2012-11-13 | (C) Pre-Introduction Letter Sent | |
2012-10-25 | (C) Fiscal Note Probable | |
2012-10-25 | (C) Draft in Assembly/Executive Director Review | |
2012-10-25 | (C) Draft in Final Drafter Review | |
2012-10-22 | (C) Bill Draft Text Available Electronically | |
2012-10-22 | (C) Draft in Input/Proofing | |
2012-10-18 | (C) Draft to Drafter - Edit Review [JLN] | |
2012-10-16 | (C) Draft in Legal Review | |
2012-10-15 | (C) Draft to Requester for Review | |
2012-08-31 | (C) Draft Request Received |