MT HB159 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 12 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-12 - Chapter Number Assigned
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 12 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-12 - Chapter Number Assigned
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Restrict authority of FWP to regulate ammo or firearms for hunting
Title
Restrict authority of FWP to regulate ammo or firearms for hunting
Sponsors
Sen. Cary Smith [R] |
Roll Calls
2011-04-20 - House - (H) 3rd Reading Passed as Amended by Senate (Y: 70 N: 28 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2011-04-19 - House - (H) 2nd Reading Senate Amendments Concurred (Y: 92 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-11 - Senate - (S) 3rd Reading Concurred (Y: 30 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-08 - Senate - (S) 2nd Reading Concurred (Y: 27 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-24 - House - (H) 3rd Reading Passed (Y: 71 N: 25 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2011-03-23 - House - (H) 2nd Reading Passed (Y: 73 N: 27 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-29 - House - (H) 2nd Reading Passed (Y: 68 N: 31 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-04-19 - House - (H) 2nd Reading Senate Amendments Concurred (Y: 92 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-11 - Senate - (S) 3rd Reading Concurred (Y: 30 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-08 - Senate - (S) 2nd Reading Concurred (Y: 27 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-24 - House - (H) 3rd Reading Passed (Y: 71 N: 25 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2011-03-23 - House - (H) 2nd Reading Passed (Y: 73 N: 27 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-29 - House - (H) 2nd Reading Passed (Y: 68 N: 31 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-12 | Chapter Number Assigned | |
2011-05-12 | (H) Signed by Governor | |
2011-05-02 | (H) Transmitted to Governor | |
2011-04-29 | (S) Signed by President | |
2011-04-26 | (H) Signed by Speaker | |
2011-04-20 | (H) Returned from Enrolling | |
2011-04-20 | (C) Printed - Enrolled Version Available | |
2011-04-20 | (H) Sent to Enrolling | |
2011-04-20 | (H) 3rd Reading Passed as Amended by Senate | |
2011-04-20 | (H) Scheduled for 3rd Reading | |
2011-04-19 | (H) 2nd Reading Senate Amendments Concurred | |
2011-04-19 | (H) Scheduled for 2nd Reading | |
2011-04-11 | (S) Returned to House with Amendments | |
2011-04-11 | (S) 3rd Reading Concurred | |
2011-04-11 | (S) Scheduled for 3rd Reading | |
2011-04-08 | (S) 2nd Reading Concurred | |
2011-04-08 | (S) Scheduled for 2nd Reading | |
2011-04-06 | (C) Printed - New Version Available | |
2011-04-06 | (S) Committee Report--Bill Concurred as Amended (S) Fish and Game | |
2011-04-05 | (S) Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred as Amended (S) Fish and Game | |
2011-04-05 | (S) Hearing (S) Fish and Game | |
2011-03-30 | (S) Referred to Committee (S) Fish and Game | |
2011-03-30 | (S) First Reading | |
2011-03-24 | (H) Transmitted to Senate | |
2011-03-24 | (H) 3rd Reading Passed | |
2011-03-24 | (H) Scheduled for 3rd Reading | |
2011-03-23 | (H) 2nd Reading Passed | |
2011-03-23 | (H) Scheduled for 2nd Reading | |
2011-03-21 | (H) Committee Report--Bill Passed (H) Appropriations | |
2011-03-18 | (H) Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed (H) Appropriations | |
2011-02-09 | (H) Hearing (H) Appropriations | |
2011-02-07 | (H) Revised Fiscal Note Printed | |
2011-02-05 | (H) Revised Fiscal Note Signed | |
2011-02-04 | (H) Revised Fiscal Note Received | |
2011-01-29 | (H) Rereferred to Committee (H) Appropriations | |
2011-01-29 | (H) 2nd Reading Passed | |
2011-01-29 | (H) Revised Fiscal Note Requested | |
2011-01-29 | (H) Scheduled for 2nd Reading | |
2011-01-26 | (C) Printed - New Version Available | |
2011-01-26 | (H) Committee Report--Bill Passed as Amended (H) Fish, Wildlife and Parks | |
2011-01-25 | (H) Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed as Amended (H) Fish, Wildlife and Parks | |
2011-01-25 | (H) Scheduled for Executive Action (H) Fish, Wildlife and Parks | |
2011-01-18 | (H) Hearing (H) Fish, Wildlife and Parks | |
2011-01-10 | (H) Fiscal Note Printed | |
2011-01-10 | (H) Sponsor List Modified | |
2011-01-10 | (H) Fiscal Note Received | |
2011-01-03 | (H) First Reading | |
2010-12-31 | (H) Referred to Committee (H) Fish, Wildlife and Parks | |
2010-12-30 | (H) Fiscal Note Requested | |
2010-12-29 | (C) Introduced Bill Text Available Electronically | |
2010-12-29 | (H) Introduced | |
2010-12-28 | (C) Pre-Introduction Letter Sent | |
2010-12-28 | (C) Pre-Introduction Letter Sent | |
2010-12-27 | (C) Draft in Assembly/Executive Director Review | |
2010-12-23 | (C) Draft in Final Drafter Review | |
2010-12-22 | (C) Bill Draft Text Available Electronically | |
2010-12-22 | (C) Draft in Input/Proofing | |
2010-12-21 | (C) Draft in Legal Review | |
2010-12-18 | (C) Draft to Requester for Review | |
2010-12-18 | (C) Fiscal Note Probable | |
2010-12-04 | (C) Draft Taken Off Hold | |
2010-10-07 | (C) Draft On Hold | |
2010-05-07 | (C) Draft On Hold | |
2010-01-27 | (C) Draft Request Received |