MT HB139 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 8 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-09 - Chapter Number Assigned
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 8 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-09 - Chapter Number Assigned
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Revise death certificate fees to fund board of morticians and funeral services
Title
Revise death certificate fees to fund board of morticians and funeral services
Sponsors
Rep. Tom Welch [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-03-24 - Senate - (S) 3rd Reading Concurred (Y: 43 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-23 - Senate - (S) 2nd Reading Concurred (Y: 47 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-16 - Senate - (S) Business, Labor, and Economic Affairs Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-18 - House - (H) 3rd Reading Passed (Y: 83 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-16 - House - (H) Appropriations Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed (Y: 20 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-12 - House - (H) 2nd Reading Passed (Y: 76 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-10 - House - (H) Business and Labor Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed as Amended (Y: 17 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-23 - Senate - (S) 2nd Reading Concurred (Y: 47 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-16 - Senate - (S) Business, Labor, and Economic Affairs Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-18 - House - (H) 3rd Reading Passed (Y: 83 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-16 - House - (H) Appropriations Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed (Y: 20 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-12 - House - (H) 2nd Reading Passed (Y: 76 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-10 - House - (H) Business and Labor Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed as Amended (Y: 17 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-09 | Chapter Number Assigned | |
2021-04-08 | House | (H) Signed by Governor |
2021-03-30 | House | (H) Transmitted to Governor |
2021-03-30 | Senate | (S) Signed by President |
2021-03-29 | House | (H) Signed by Speaker |
2021-03-26 | (C) Printed - Enrolled Version Available | |
2021-03-26 | House | (H) Returned from Enrolling |
2021-03-25 | House | (H) Sent to Enrolling |
2021-03-24 | Senate | (S) Returned to House |
2021-03-24 | Senate | (S) 3rd Reading Concurred |
2021-03-24 | Senate | (S) Scheduled for 3rd Reading |
2021-03-23 | Senate | (S) 2nd Reading Concurred |
2021-03-23 | Senate | (S) Scheduled for 2nd Reading |
2021-03-17 | Senate | (S) Committee Report--Bill Concurred (S) Business, Labor, and Economic Affairs |
2021-03-16 | Senate | (S) Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred (S) Business, Labor, and Economic Affairs |
2021-03-11 | Senate | (S) Hearing (S) Business, Labor, and Economic Affairs |
2021-03-01 | House | (H) Revised Fiscal Note Printed |
2021-02-27 | House | (H) Revised Fiscal Note Signed |
2021-02-26 | House | (H) Revised Fiscal Note Received |
2021-02-19 | Senate | (S) Referred to Committee (S) Business, Labor, and Economic Affairs |
2021-02-19 | Senate | (S) First Reading |
2021-02-18 | House | (H) Transmitted to Senate |
2021-02-18 | House | (H) 3rd Reading Passed |
2021-02-18 | House | (H) Scheduled for 3rd Reading |
2021-02-17 | House | (H) Committee Report--Bill Passed (H) Appropriations |
2021-02-16 | House | (H) Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed (H) Appropriations |
2021-02-15 | House | (H) Revised Fiscal Note Requested |
2021-02-15 | House | (H) Hearing (H) Appropriations |
2021-02-12 | House | (H) Rereferred to Committee (H) Appropriations |
2021-02-12 | House | (H) 2nd Reading Passed |
2021-02-12 | House | (H) Scheduled for 2nd Reading |
2021-02-10 | (C) Printed - New Version Available | |
2021-02-10 | House | (H) Committee Report--Bill Passed as Amended (H) Business and Labor |
2021-02-10 | House | (H) Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed as Amended (H) Business and Labor |
2021-02-05 | House | (H) Hearing (H) Business and Labor |
2021-01-26 | (C) Amendments Available | |
2021-01-19 | House | (H) Fiscal Note Printed |
2021-01-19 | (C) Fiscal Note Unsigned | |
2021-01-19 | House | (H) Hearing Canceled (H) Business and Labor |
2021-01-19 | House | (H) Fiscal Note Received |
2021-01-11 | House | (H) Fiscal Note Requested |
2021-01-08 | (C) Introduced Bill Text Available Electronically | |
2021-01-08 | House | (H) First Reading (H) Business and Labor |
2021-01-08 | House | (H) Referred to Committee (H) Business and Labor |
2021-01-08 | House | (H) Introduced |
2021-01-03 | (C) Draft Ready for Delivery | |
2020-12-31 | (C) Executive Director Final Review | |
2020-12-31 | (C) Draft Ready for Delivery | |
2020-12-27 | (C) Draft in Assembly | |
2020-12-26 | (C) Executive Director Review | |
2020-12-24 | (C) Bill Draft Text Available Electronically | |
2020-12-24 | (C) Draft in Final Drafter Review | |
2020-12-23 | (C) Draft in Input/Proofing | |
2020-12-23 | (C) Draft to Drafter - Edit Review [CMD] | |
2020-12-18 | (C) Draft in Edit | |
2020-12-18 | (C) Draft in Legal Review | |
2020-12-09 | (C) Draft to Requester for Review | |
2020-11-14 | (C) Draft Request Received |
Subjects
Counties
Professions and Occupations E-N
Professions and Occupations O-Z
Revenue, State
Rule Making
State Government
Professions and Occupations E-N
Professions and Occupations O-Z
Revenue, State
Rule Making
State Government