MT HB112 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 2 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-02 - Chapter Number Assigned
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 2 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-02 - Chapter Number Assigned
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Revise uniform dispute review procedures for collection of delinquent taxes
Title
Revise uniform dispute review procedures for collection of delinquent taxes
Sponsors
Rep. Dave Fern [D] |
Roll Calls
2017-02-16 - Senate - (S) 3rd Reading Concurred (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-02-15 - Senate - (S) 2nd Reading Concurred (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-02-10 - Senate - (S) Taxation Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-31 - House - (H) 3rd Reading Passed (Y: 96 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-01-30 - House - (H) 2nd Reading Passed (Y: 95 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-27 - House - (H) Taxation Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-15 - Senate - (S) 2nd Reading Concurred (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-02-10 - Senate - (S) Taxation Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-31 - House - (H) 3rd Reading Passed (Y: 96 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-01-30 - House - (H) 2nd Reading Passed (Y: 95 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-27 - House - (H) Taxation Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-02 | Chapter Number Assigned | |
2017-03-02 | House | (H) Signed by Governor |
2017-02-23 | House | (H) Transmitted to Governor |
2017-02-22 | Senate | (S) Signed by President |
2017-02-22 | House | (H) Signed by Speaker |
2017-02-21 | House | (H) Returned from Enrolling |
2017-02-20 | (C) Printed - Enrolled Version Available | |
2017-02-17 | House | (H) Sent to Enrolling |
2017-02-16 | Senate | (S) Returned to House |
2017-02-16 | Senate | (S) 3rd Reading Concurred |
2017-02-16 | Senate | (S) Scheduled for 3rd Reading |
2017-02-15 | Senate | (S) 2nd Reading Concurred |
2017-02-15 | Senate | (S) Scheduled for 2nd Reading |
2017-02-13 | Senate | (S) Committee Report--Bill Concurred (S) Taxation |
2017-02-10 | Senate | (S) Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred (S) Taxation |
2017-02-07 | Senate | (S) Hearing (S) Taxation |
2017-02-01 | Senate | (S) Referred to Committee (S) Taxation |
2017-02-01 | Senate | (S) First Reading |
2017-01-31 | House | (H) Transmitted to Senate |
2017-01-31 | House | (H) 3rd Reading Passed |
2017-01-31 | House | (H) Scheduled for 3rd Reading |
2017-01-30 | House | (H) 2nd Reading Passed |
2017-01-30 | House | (H) Scheduled for 2nd Reading |
2017-01-27 | House | (H) Committee Report--Bill Passed (H) Taxation |
2017-01-27 | House | (H) Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed (H) Taxation |
2017-01-13 | House | (H) Hearing (H) Taxation |
2017-01-06 | House | (H) Fiscal Note Printed |
2017-01-04 | House | (H) Fiscal Note Signed |
2017-01-04 | House | (H) Fiscal Note Received |
2017-01-02 | House | (H) First Reading (H) Taxation |
2016-12-27 | House | (H) Referred to Committee (H) Taxation |
2016-12-14 | House | (H) Fiscal Note Requested |
2016-12-14 | (C) Introduced Bill Text Available Electronically | |
2016-12-14 | House | (H) Introduced |
2016-12-05 | (C) Pre-Introduction Letter Sent | |
2016-12-05 | (C) Draft in Assembly | |
2016-12-05 | (C) Executive Director Review | |
2016-12-05 | (C) Bill Draft Text Available Electronically | |
2016-12-05 | (C) Draft in Final Drafter Review | |
2016-12-02 | (C) Draft in Input/Proofing | |
2016-12-02 | (C) Draft to Drafter - Edit Review [CMD] | |
2016-12-02 | (C) Draft in Edit | |
2016-11-29 | (C) Draft in Legal Review | |
2016-11-22 | (C) Draft to Requester for Review | |
2016-06-13 | (C) Draft Request Received |